EP2771493 - HIGH PERFORMANCE AISIMGCU CASTING ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcoa USA Corp. 201 Isabella Street Pittsburgh, PA 15212-5858 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | For all designated states Alcoa USA Corp. 201 Isabella Street Pittsburgh PA 15212-5858 / US | ||
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states Alcoa Inc. Alcoa Corporate Center 201 Isabella Street Pittsburgh, PA 15212-5858 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAN, Xinyan 3801 Buckingham Court Murryville, PA 15668 / US | 02 /
LIN, Jen, C. 1001 Alton Court Export, PA 15632 / US | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | Lenzing Gerber Stute PartG von Patentanwälten m.b.B. Bahnstraße 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Lenzing Gerber Stute Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Bahnstraße 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2014/36] | Lenzing Gerber Stute Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten Bahnstraße 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12787267.9 | 26.10.2012 | [2016/37] | WO2012US62250 | Priority number, date | US201161628321P | 28.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161628321 P | [2014/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013063488 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2771493 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2771493 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2771493 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | [2017/32] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2771493 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/02, C22C21/04 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
C22F1/043 (EP,CN);
C22C21/02 (EP,CN);
C22C21/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHLEISTUNGS-ALSIMGCU-GUSS-LEGIERUNG | [2016/28] | English: | HIGH PERFORMANCE AISIMGCU CASTING ALLOY | [2014/36] | French: | ALLIAGE DE MOULAGE PAR COULÉE D'ALSIMGCU À HAUTE PERFORMANCE | [2014/36] |
Former [2014/36] | HOCHLEISTUNGSFÄHIGE AI/SI/MG/CU-GUSSLEGIERUNG | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 07.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2012 | AL | 14.09.2016 | BE | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | HR | 14.09.2016 | LT | 14.09.2016 | LV | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | MK | 14.09.2016 | NL | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | RS | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | SM | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | IE | 26.10.2016 | LU | 26.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | IS | 14.01.2017 | PT | 16.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 26.10.2012 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
TR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.10.2012 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 26.10.2012 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | BE | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.10.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | BE | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | BE | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | BE | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | BE | 14.09.2016 | |
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | BE | 14.09.2016 | |
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 14.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19524564 (VAW ALUCAST GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [XI] - LUMLEY R N ET AL, "Rapid Heat Treatment of Aluminum High-Pressure Diecastings", METALLURGICAL AND MATERIALS TRANSACTIONS A, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NEW YORK, (20090502), vol. 40, no. 7, ISSN 1543-1940, pages 1716 - 1726, XP019696606 [X] 1-6,8,9,11,15 * table 2 * [I] 7,10,12-14,16-24 | [I] - T. KRAFT ET AL, "Predicting microstructure and microsegregation in multicomponent alloys", JOM, (19971201), vol. 49, no. 12, doi:10.1007/s11837-997-0025-4, ISSN 1047-4838, pages 20 - 28, XP055072397 [I] 25-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11837-997-0025-4 | [I] - X. YAN ET AL, "Computational and experimental investigation of microsegregation in an Al-rich Al-Cu-Mg-Si quaternary alloy", ACTA MATERIALIA, (20020501), vol. 50, no. 9, doi:10.1016/S1359-6454(01)00431-1, ISSN 1359-6454, pages 2199 - 2207, XP055072398 [I] 25-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6454(01)00431-1 | [I] - S.-L. CHEN ET AL, "The PANDAT software package and its applications", CALPHAD, (20020601), vol. 26, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0364-5916(02)00034-2, ISSN 0364-5916, pages 175 - 188, XP055072399 [I] 25-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0364-5916(02)00034-2 | [I] - S. -L. CHEN ET AL, "Calculating phase diagrams using PANDAT and panengine", JOM, (20031201), vol. 55, no. 12, doi:10.1007/s11837-003-0010-5, ISSN 1047-4838, pages 48 - 51, XP055072400 [I] 25-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11837-003-0010-5 | [A] - S. Sunday ET AL, "A Study of the Mechanical Properties of Cast-to-Wrought Aluminium Welds", Welding Research Supplement, (19840201), URL: http://www.aws.org/wj/supplement/WJ_1984_02_s47.pdf, (20130503), XP055061759 [A] 1-24 | by applicant | - ASM Handbook, ASM INTERNATIONAL, (200812), vol. 15 |