EP2715904 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTEGRATING AND MANAGING DEMAND/RESPONSE BETWEEN ALTERNATIVE ENERGY SOURCES, GRID POWER, AND LOADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cameron, D. Kevin 802 Ladis Ct. Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2014/15] | Application number, filing date | 12788979.8 | 24.05.2012 | [2016/26] | WO2012US39480 | Priority number, date | US201161489263P | 24.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161489263 P | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012162570 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2715904 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2715904 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 29.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/36, H02J3/38 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
H02J1/14 (EP,US);
H02J7/34 (EP,US);
H02J7/35 (EP,US);
H02J1/102 (EP,US);
H02J2300/24 (EP,US);
H02J2300/26 (EP,US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
H02J2300/30 (EP,US);
H02J2310/14 (EP,US);
H02J2310/48 (EP,US);
H02J2310/66 (EP);
H02J3/28 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J9/061 (EP,US);
Y02B10/70 (EP,US);
Y02B90/10 (US);
Y02E10/56 (EP,US);
Y02E10/76 (EP,US);
Y02E60/00 (US);
Y02T90/167 (EP);
Y04S10/126 (US);
Y04S30/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE INTEGRATION UND VERWALTUNG VON NACHFRAGEN/REAKTIONEN ZWISCHEN ALTERNATIVEN ENERGIEQUELLEN, NETZLEISTUNGEN UND LASTEN | [2014/15] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTEGRATING AND MANAGING DEMAND/RESPONSE BETWEEN ALTERNATIVE ENERGY SOURCES, GRID POWER, AND LOADS | [2014/15] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR INTÉGRER ET GÉRER UNE DEMANDE/RÉPONSE ENTRE DES SOURCES D'ÉNERGIE ALTERNATIVE, UN RÉSEAU ÉLECTRIQUE ET DES CHARGES | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 18.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.05.2012 | AL | 29.06.2016 | AT | 29.06.2016 | BE | 29.06.2016 | CY | 29.06.2016 | CZ | 29.06.2016 | DK | 29.06.2016 | EE | 29.06.2016 | ES | 29.06.2016 | FI | 29.06.2016 | HR | 29.06.2016 | LT | 29.06.2016 | LV | 29.06.2016 | MC | 29.06.2016 | MK | 29.06.2016 | NL | 29.06.2016 | PL | 29.06.2016 | RO | 29.06.2016 | RS | 29.06.2016 | SI | 29.06.2016 | SK | 29.06.2016 | SM | 29.06.2016 | TR | 29.06.2016 | BG | 29.09.2016 | NO | 29.09.2016 | GR | 30.09.2016 | IS | 29.10.2016 | PT | 31.10.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 24.05.2012 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MK | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 24.05.2012 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.05.2012 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 29.06.2016 | |
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 29.06.2016 | |
NO | 29.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011027195 (ABB TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011068624 (DIBACHI RHONDA [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2011098873 (ABB TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH], et al) [AP] 1-8* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH07159592 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]RU2002135603 (YATROVA LARISA IVANOVNA); | [A]WO2010018264 (UNIV VALENCIA POLITECNICA [ES], et al); | [A]WO2011023678 (THALES SA [FR], et al) |