EP2715553 - ASYNCHRONOUS REPLICATION IN A DISTRIBUTED STORAGE ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2014/15] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALDER, Bradley, Gene c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
NILAKANTAN, Niranjan c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
SRIVASTAV, Shashwat c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
WU, Jiesheng c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
ABBASI, Abdul, Rafay c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
MAINALI, Shane c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 07 /
UDDARAJU, Padmanabha, Chakravarthy c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/08] |
Former [2014/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12789199.2 | 18.05.2012 | [2016/08] | WO2012US38651 | Priority number, date | US201113113688 | 23.05.2011 Original published format: US201113113688 | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012162173 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2715553 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2715553 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
G06F16/273 (EP,US);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G06F11/2074 (US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F16/278 (EP,US);
G06F16/282 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/15] | G06F15/16, G06F12/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ASYNCHRONE REPLIKATION IN EINER VERTEILTEN SPEICHERUMGEBUNG | [2014/15] | English: | ASYNCHRONOUS REPLICATION IN A DISTRIBUTED STORAGE ENVIRONMENT | [2014/15] | French: | DUPLICATION ASYNCHRONE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT DE STOCKAGE DISTRIBUÉ | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 10.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.05.2012 | AL | 24.02.2016 | AT | 24.02.2016 | BE | 24.02.2016 | CY | 24.02.2016 | CZ | 24.02.2016 | DK | 24.02.2016 | EE | 24.02.2016 | ES | 24.02.2016 | FI | 24.02.2016 | HR | 24.02.2016 | IS | 24.02.2016 | IT | 24.02.2016 | LT | 24.02.2016 | LV | 24.02.2016 | MC | 24.02.2016 | MK | 24.02.2016 | PL | 24.02.2016 | RO | 24.02.2016 | RS | 24.02.2016 | SE | 24.02.2016 | SI | 24.02.2016 | SK | 24.02.2016 | SM | 24.02.2016 | TR | 24.02.2016 | IE | 18.05.2016 | LU | 18.05.2016 | BG | 24.05.2016 | NO | 24.05.2016 | GR | 25.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | PT | 24.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.05.2012 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IS | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 18.05.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.05.2012 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 18.05.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.05.2012 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 18.05.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 18.05.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004250031 (JI MINWEN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 2,3,5a,5b * * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0052] - [0058] *; | [X]US2010030818 (COOPER BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0011] , [0033] , [0034] , [0035] - [0041] *; | [A]US2011099342 (OZDEMIR KADIR [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0010] , [0011] * | International search | [A]US2005091391 (BURTON DAVID A [US], et al); | [A]US2008016300 (YIM WAI C [US], et al); | [A]US7647449 (ROY SUBHOJIT [IN], et al); | [A]US2010082540 (ISAACSON CORY M [US], et al) | by applicant | US2012030818 |