EP2710538 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR RECOMMENDING MERCHANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MasterCard International Incorporated 2000 Purchase Street Purchase, NY 10577 / US | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARO, Walter Lo 14392 Tealcrest Drive Chesterfield, Missouri 63017 / US | 02 /
MERZ, Christopher J. 10 Flowery Branch Place Wildwood, Missouri 63040 / US | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12789273.5 | 18.05.2012 | WO2012US38515 | Priority number, date | US201113112744 | 20.05.2011 Original published format: US201113112744 | [2014/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012162125 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2710538 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
G06Q30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM EMPFEHLEN VON HÄNDLERN | [2014/13] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR RECOMMENDING MERCHANTS | [2014/13] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR RECOMMANDER DES COMMERÇANTS | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 24.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.01.2017 | 11.01.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/23] | 03.02.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2011068170 (LEHMAN GARRETT DELOS [US]) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-6 *; | [I]US2009307060 (MERZ CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-4 *; | [I]US2009254463 (TOMCHEK BRAD MICHAEL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-5 *; | [I]US2010301114 (LO FARO WALTER F [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-6 *; | [I]US2011035279 (HERMAN PAUL A [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [I]US2010256982 (BHAGCHANDANI PUNEET B [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figure 1 * | [I] - Wikipedia, "Interbank network", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20110216), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Interbank_network&oldid=414221461, (20140822), XP055135992 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2010312724 (PINCKNEY THOMAS [US], et al); | [Y]US2007038515 (POSTREL RICHARD [US]) | by applicant | US2011068170 | US2009307060 | US2009254463 | US2010301114 | US2011035279 | US2010256982 | - WIKIPEDIA, INTERBANK NETWORK, (20110216), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Interbank_network&oldid=414221461 |