EP2716883 - DIAGNOSTICS METHOD FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koltunov, Georgii Anatolievich Ul. Khalturina 11-71 Poltava 36014 / UA | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Kretschmann, Dennis Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstraße 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Kretschmann, Dennis Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstraße 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12789591.0 | 13.01.2012 | WO2012UA00004 | Priority number, date | UA20110006464 | 23.05.2011 Original published format: UA 2011006464 | [2014/15] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012161668 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | RU | [2012/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2716883 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 29.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01M11/03, G01M15/02 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
F01M11/10 (EP,US);
G01M15/02 (EP,KR,US);
G01M15/04 (US);
F01M11/03 (KR);
F01M2001/1007 (EP,US);
F16N2200/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Title | German: | KONTROLLVERFAHREN FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTORBAUTEILE | [2014/15] | English: | DIAGNOSTICS METHOD FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE PARTS | [2014/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC DES PIÈCES D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2013 | Translation filed | 16.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 21.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/44] | 13.06.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.06.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5316665 (HART ROBERT M [US]) [X] 1* column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 6 * | International search | [A]DE2427595 (WULFERT RAINER); | [Y]RU2201790 (KOLTUNOV ANATOLIJ NIKOLAEVICH [UA]); | [Y]RU2216717 (OOO DIAGNOSTICHESKIE T); | [A]RU2369854 (AVIADVIGATEL AOOT [RU]) | by applicant | RU2390746 | RU2399898 |