EP2780586 - WIND TURBINE ROTOR BLADE AND METHOD FOR DEICING A WIND TURBINE ROTOR BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wobben Properties GmbH Borsigstrasse 26 26607 Aurich / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2014/39] | For all designated states Wobben Properties GmbH Dreekamp 5 26605 Aurich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LENSCHOW, Gerhard Baltrumstrasse 4 26603 Aurich / DE | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12790856.4 | 16.11.2012 | WO2012EP72822 | Priority number, date | DE20111086603 | 17.11.2011 Original published format: DE102011086603 | [2014/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013072456 | Date: | 23.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2780586 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F03D11/00, F03D1/06 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
F03D80/40 (EP,US);
F03D1/0633 (KR);
F03D1/0675 (EP,US);
F05B2260/20 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/39] | Extension states | BA | 17.06.2014 | ME | 17.06.2014 | Title | German: | WINDENERGIEANLAGEN-ROTORBLATT UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTEISEN EINES WINDENERGIEANLAGEN-ROTORBLATTES | [2014/39] | English: | WIND TURBINE ROTOR BLADE AND METHOD FOR DEICING A WIND TURBINE ROTOR BLADE | [2014/39] | French: | PALE DE ROTOR D'ÉOLIENNE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉGIVRER UNE PALE DE ROTOR D'ÉOLIENNE | [2014/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 17.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/33] | 13.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2053240 (ACTIFLOW B V [NL]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0020] , [0021] * * figures 3,5,6 * [I] 5,6,10; | [XYI]DE60313347T (BATTISTI LORENZO [IT]) [X] 1,2,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0063] , [0065] , [0072] , [0115] , [0118] , [0119] * * figures 2,9-14 * [Y] 4,7 [I] 3,5,6,8,10; | [Y]DE102010015595 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [Y] 4,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0035] , [0050] * * figure 3 * | by applicant | DE102010051296 | DE102010051297 | DE102010051293 | DE102010030472 | DE102005034131 | DE19528862 | DE20014238U |