EP2791900 - IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, METHOD THEREOF, AND NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTOH, Kenji c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12791575.9 | 29.10.2012 | WO2012JP06926 | Priority number, date | JP20110271070 | 12.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011271070 | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013088629 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2791900 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, H04N13/02, H04N13/00 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
H04N13/221 (EP,KR,US);
G06T7/00 (KR);
H04N13/225 (US);
H04N13/128 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN DAFÜR UND ÜBERGANGSLOSES COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2014/43] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, METHOD THEREOF, AND NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2014/43] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR NON TRANSITOIRE | [2014/43] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 09.01.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2009096912 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [X] 1,19,20 * abstract *; | [AD]JP2011055022 (SONY CORP) [AD] 1-20* the whole document *; | [X] - DONGHYUN KIM ET AL, "A Stereoscopic Video Generation Method Using Stereoscopic Display Characterization and Motion Analysis", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BROADCASTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080601), vol. 54, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TBC.2007.914714, ISSN 0018-9316, pages 188 - 197, XP011343405 [X] 1-20 * page 191 - page 192; figures 6-9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBC.2007.914714 | [X] - LIANG ZHANG ET AL, "3D-TV Content Creation: Automatic 2D-to-3D Video Conversion", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BROADCASTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20110601), vol. 57, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TBC.2011.2122930, ISSN 0018-9316, pages 372 - 383, XP011323530 [X] 1,19,20 * page 376 - page 377 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBC.2011.2122930 | by applicant | JP2006114023 | JP2011055022 |