EP2785832 - HAPLOID CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMBA-Institut für Molekulare Biotechnologie GmbH Dr. Bohrgasse 3-5 1030 Vienna / AT | [2014/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLING, Ulrich Schönbrunner Strasse 2/1/47 A-1040 Vienna / AT | 02 /
PENNINGER, Josef Himmelhofgasse 62 A-1130 Vienna / AT | 03 /
TAUBENSCHMID, Jasmin Gunterlweg 12 A-3552 Stratzing / AT | [2014/41] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 12791811.8 | 30.11.2012 | WO2012EP74112 | Priority number, date | EP20110191408 | 30.11.2011 Original published format: EP 11191408 | US201161565626P | 01.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161565626 P | [2014/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013079670 | Date: | 06.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2785832 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0735, G01N33/50 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
C12N5/0606 (EP,US);
C12Q1/025 (US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C12Q1/686 (US);
G01N33/5014 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Title | German: | HAPLOIDZELLEN | [2014/41] | English: | HAPLOID CELLS | [2014/41] | French: | CELLULES HAPLOÏDES | [2014/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 15.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2015 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 21.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2017 | Observations by third parties | 24.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/40] | 18.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2017 | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 09.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 09.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.03.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDY] - LEEB MARTIN ET AL, "Derivation of haploid embryonic stem cells from mouse embryos.", NATURE 3 NOV 2011 LNKD- DOI:10.1038/NATURE10448 PUBMED:21900896, (20111103), vol. 479, no. 7371, ISSN 1476-4687, pages 131 - 134, XP055029866 [XD] 1,3-23,25 * the whole document * [Y] 2,24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature10448 | [YD] - KAUFMAN M H ET AL, "Establishment of pluripotential cell lines from haploid mouse embryos.", JOURNAL OF EMBRYOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL MORPHOLOGY FEB 1983 LNKD- PUBMED:6875460, (198302), vol. 73, ISSN 0022-0752, pages 249 - 261, XP000569942 [YD] 2 * the whole document * | [YD] - WU TONG ET AL, "Reprogramming of trophoblast stem cells into pluripotent stem cells by Oct4.", STEM CELLS (DAYTON, OHIO) MAY 2011, (201105), vol. 29, no. 5, ISSN 1549-4918, pages 755 - 763, XP055052764 [YD] 24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/stem.617 | [XDP] - ELLING ULRICH ET AL, "Forward and reverse genetics through derivation of haploid mouse embryonic stem cells.", CELL STEM CELL 2 DEC 2011 LNKD- PUBMED:22136931, (20111202), vol. 9, no. 6, ISSN 1875-9777, pages 563 - 574, XP028335475 [XDP] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.stem.2011.10.012 | [XP] - SCHIMENTI JOHN, "Haploid embryonic stem cells and the dominance of recessive traits.", CELL STEM CELL 2 DEC 2011 LNKD- PUBMED:22136917, (20111202), vol. 9, no. 6, ISSN 1875-9777, pages 488 - 489, XP028335465 [XP] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.stem.2011.11.006 | by applicant | WO0129208 | WO0130978 | WO0132015 | US6235970 | WO02088353 | WO2006056615 | WO2006056617 | US7235654 | WO2008033469 | US7592175 | WO2012117254 | - BURKART ET AL., BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 8, pages 1937 - 1946 | - BUCHSEL ET AL., EUR J BIOCHEM, (1980), vol. 111, pages 445 - 453 | - BRYJA ET AL., NAT PROTOC, (2006), vol. 1, pages 2082 - 2087 | - CARETTE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 326, pages 1231 - 1235 | - CARETTE ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2011), vol. 29, pages 542 - 546 | - CARETTE ET AL., NATURE, (2011), vol. 477, pages 340 - 343 | - CAVALERI; SCHOLER, CELL, (2003), page 113,551 | - EVANS ET AL., NATURE, (1981), vol. 292, pages 154 - 156 | - FELLMANN ET AL., MOL CELL, (2011), vol. 41, pages 733 - 746 | - HARTWELL ET AL., SCIENCE, (1974), vol. 183, pages 46 - 51 | - HOSOGUCHI ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2010), vol. 53, pages 5607 - 5619 | - KAUFMAN ET AL., J EMBRYOL EXP MORPHOL, (1983), vol. 73, pages 249 - 261 | - KROTZ ET AL., J ASSIST REPROD GENET, (2010), vol. 27, no. 12, pages 743 - 50 | - LATHAM ET AL., BIOL REPROD, (2002), vol. 67, pages 386 - 392 | - LEE ET AL., J AM CHEM SOC, (2003), vol. 125, pages 9588 - 9589 | - LEEB, M.; WUTZ, A., NATURE, (2011), vol. 479, no. 7371, pages 131 - 134 | - LI ET AL., NATURE, (2012), vol. 490, no. 7420, pages 407 - 11 | - LORTHONGPANICH ET AL., INT J DEV BIOL., (2010), vol. 54, no. 11-12, pages 1631 - 40 | - MARTIN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1981), vol. 78, pages 7634 - 7638 | - MITSUI ET AL., CELL, (2003), vol. 113, page 643 | - OTAEGUI ET AL., CLONING, (1999), vol. 1, pages 111 - 117 | - OTTO ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 292, pages 2441 - 2443 | - POLLARD ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL, (2006), vol. 418, pages 151 - 169 | - SCHNUTGEN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2008), vol. 36, page E133 | - READY M. ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1984), vol. 259, no. 24, pages 15252 - 15256 | - RILLAHAN ET AL., NATURE CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (2012), pages 661 - 668 | - SIMMONS ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (1985), vol. 146, pages 206 - 210 | - WALKER ET AL., CELL STEM CELL, (2010), vol. 6, pages 153 - 166 | - WALKER ET AL., CELL STEM CELL, (2007), vol. 1, pages 71 - 86 | - WU ET AL., STEM CELLS, (2011), vol. 29, no. 5, pages 755 - 63 | - ZUBER ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2010), vol. 29, pages 79 - 83 | - ZUBER ET AL., NATURE, (2011), vol. 478, pages 524 - 528 | - ELLING ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2006), vol. 103, pages 16319 - 16324 | - TAKAHASHI ET AL., CELL, (2006), vol. 126, pages 663 - 676 | - CHAMBERS ET AL., CELL, (2003), vol. 113, pages 643 - 655 | - THOMSON ET AL., GENES DEV, (1988), vol. 2, pages 1344 - 1351 | - THOMSON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 7844 - 7848 | - CHONG ET AL., J EXP MED, (2008), vol. 205, pages 2005 - 2017 | - WANG ET AL., NAT GENET, (2007), vol. 39, pages 380 - 385 | - YAN ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 403, pages 723 - 724 | - YI ET AL., SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 326, pages 430 - 433 | - ELLING ET AL., CELL STEM CELL, (2011), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 563 - 574 | - SCHIMENTI, CELL STEM CELL, (2011), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 488 - 489 |