EP2715447 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EXTENDING DEPTH OF FIELD IN A LENS SYSTEM BY USE OF COLOR-DEPENDENT WAVEFRONT CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OmniVision Technologies, Inc. 4295 Burton Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Lu 664 Encore Way San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 02 /
GREENGARD, Adam, Douglas 2161 Enterprise Street Superior, CO 80027 / US | [2014/21] |
Former [2014/17] | 01 /
GAO, Lu 664 Encore Way San Jose, CA 95134 / US | ||
02 /
GREENGARD, Adam, Douglas 1611 Cottonwood Drive 11 Louisville, CO 80027 / US | |||
Former [2014/15] | 01 /
GAO, Lu 664 Encore Way San Jose, CA 95134 / US | ||
02 /
GREENGARD, Adam, Douglas 1611 Cottonwood Drive 11 Louisville, CO 80027 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/29] | m patent group Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/15] | Kudlek & Grunert Patentanwälte Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12793083.2 | 31.05.2012 | [2018/29] | WO2012US40323 | Priority number, date | US201113149707 | 31.05.2011 Original published format: US201113149707 | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012166995 | Date: | 06.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2715447 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2715447 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/00, H04N5/232, H04N9/04, G02B5/20 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
G02B27/0075 (EP,US);
H04N23/959 (EP,US);
G02B5/201 (EP,US);
H04N25/133 (EP,US);
H04N25/135 (EP,US);
H04N25/6153 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/09] | G03B17/02, G03B3/02, H04N5/225, H04N5/232, G02B27/00, H04N9/04 | ||
Former IPC [2014/15] | G03B17/02, G03B3/02, H04N5/225 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERWEITERUNG DER TIEFENSCHÄRFE EINES LINSENSYSTEMS DURCH VERWENDUNG EINER FARBABHÄNGIGEN WELLENFRONTKODIERUNG | [2014/15] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EXTENDING DEPTH OF FIELD IN A LENS SYSTEM BY USE OF COLOR-DEPENDENT WAVEFRONT CODING | [2014/15] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS À ÉTENDRE LA PROFONDEUR DE CHAMP DANS UN SYSTÈME DE LENTILLE À L'AIDE D'UN CODAGE DE FRONT D'ONDE DÉPENDANT DE LA COULEUR | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 15.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.05.2012 | AL | 18.07.2018 | AT | 18.07.2018 | CY | 18.07.2018 | CZ | 18.07.2018 | DK | 18.07.2018 | EE | 18.07.2018 | ES | 18.07.2018 | FI | 18.07.2018 | HR | 18.07.2018 | IT | 18.07.2018 | LT | 18.07.2018 | LV | 18.07.2018 | MC | 18.07.2018 | MK | 18.07.2018 | MT | 18.07.2018 | NL | 18.07.2018 | PL | 18.07.2018 | RO | 18.07.2018 | RS | 18.07.2018 | SE | 18.07.2018 | SI | 18.07.2018 | SK | 18.07.2018 | SM | 18.07.2018 | TR | 18.07.2018 | BG | 18.10.2018 | NO | 18.10.2018 | GR | 19.10.2018 | IS | 18.11.2018 | PT | 18.11.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 31.05.2012 | |
AL | 18.07.2018 | ||
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CY | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 31.05.2012 | |
AL | 18.07.2018 | ||
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CY | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CY | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 18.07.2018 | |
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 18.07.2018 | |
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 18.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9957599 (UNIV TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]); | [X]FR2919733 (DXO LABS SA [FR]); | [X]WO2010017694 (TYPONTEQ COMPANY [CN], et al); | [X]US2010123809 (EGAWA YOSHITAKA [JP]); | [X]US2010226011 (SZAPIEL STANISLAW [CA], et al); | [XP]US2012063008 (JIA WEI [CN], et al) | International search | [A]US2004145808 (CATHEY WADE THOMAS [US], et al); | [A]US2006171041 (OLMSTEAD BRYAN L [US], et al); | [A]US2008203276 (DOWSKI EDWARD R [US], et al); | [A]US2010128137 (GUIDASH ROBERT M [US]) | by applicant | US2010226011 |