EP2716602 - COPPER FOIL FOR PRODUCING GRAPHENE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING GRAPHENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8164 / JP | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIBA, Yoshihiro c/o Technology Development Center JX Nippon Mining&Metals Corporation 1-1-2 Shiroganecho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317-0056 / JP | 02 /
YAMAJI, Tatsuya c/o Technology Development Center JX Nippon Mining&Metals Corporation 1-1-2 Shiroganecho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317-0056 / JP | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12793262.2 | 09.04.2012 | WO2012JP59652 | Priority number, date | JP20110124686 | 02.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011124686 | JP20110124798 | 03.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011124798 | JP20110260509 | 29.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011260509 | [2014/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012165051 | Date: | 06.12.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2716602 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/04, B21B1/40, B21B1/00, C22C9/00, C22C9/02, B01J37/18, B01J23/72, B01J27/04, B01J37/00, B32B15/20, B82Y30/00, B82Y40/00, C22F1/08, B21B3/00 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
C01B32/186 (EP,US);
C01B32/16 (KR);
B01J23/72 (EP,US);
B21B1/40 (KR);
B21B3/00 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C22C9/00 (EP,KR,US);
C22C9/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/05] | C01B31/04, B21B1/40, B21B1/00, C22C9/00, C22C9/02, B01J37/18, B01J23/72, B01J27/04, B01J37/00, B32B15/20, B82Y30/00, B82Y40/00, C22F1/08 | ||
Former IPC [2014/15] | C01B31/02, B21B1/40, B21B3/00, C22C9/00, C22C9/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Title | German: | KUPFERFOLIE ZUR GRAPHENHERSTELLUNG UND GRAPHENHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2014/15] | English: | COPPER FOIL FOR PRODUCING GRAPHENE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING GRAPHENE | [2014/15] | French: | FEUILLE DE CUIVRE POUR FABRICATION DE GRAPHÈNE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE GRAPHÈNE | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2013 | Translation filed | 28.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 02.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 09.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JP2000256765 (NIPPON MINING CO) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraphs [0009] , [ 0019] - paragraph [0023] * [A] 3,4 [Y] 7; | [A]JP2011070830 (JX NIPPON MINING & METALS CORP) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * | [YA] - SUKANG BAE ET AL, "Roll-to-roll production of 30-inch graphene films for transparent electrodes", NATURE NANOTECHNOLOGY, (20100625), vol. 5, no. 8, doi:10.1038/nnano.2010.132, ISSN 1748-3387, pages 574 - 578, XP055049935 [Y] 7 * page 574 - page 575 * [A] 1-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nnano.2010.132 | [XAYI] - S. K. SMOUKOV ET AL, "Freestanding Three-Dimensional Copper Foils Prepared by Electroless Deposition on Micropatterned Gels", ADVANCED MATERIALS, (20050311), vol. 17, no. 6, doi:10.1002/adma.200401010, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 751 - 755, XP055186354 [X] 3-5 * page 751; figures 1a, 2h, 3a, * [A] 1,2 [Y] 7 [I] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.200401010 | [A] - ZHENGTANG LUO ET AL, "Effect of substrate roughness and feedstock concentration on growth of wafer-scale graphene at atmospheric pressure", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 23, no. 6, doi:10.1021/CM1028854, ISSN 1520-5002, (20110322), pages 1441 - 1447, (20110210), XP002695338 [A] 1-7 * Experimental section;; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/CM1028854 | [A] - XUESONG LI ET AL, "Large-area synthesis of high-quality and uniform graphene films on copper foils", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, US, vol. 324, no. 5932, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1171245, ISSN 0036-8075, (20090605), pages 1312 - 1314, (20090507), XP008127472 [A] 1-7 * Supporting Online Material * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1171245 | International search | [Y]JP2009143799 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]JP2011051801 (NAT INST FOR MATERIALS SCIENCE); | [AE]JP2012006824 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) | [X] - LUO, Z. ET AL., "Effect of Substrate Roughness and Feedstock Concentration on Growth of Wafer- Scale Graphene at Atmospheric Pressure", CHEM. MATER., (20110210), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 1441 - 1447, XP002695338 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/CM1028854 | by applicant | JP2009143799 | - SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 324, pages 1312 - 1314 |