EP2716710 - RESIN COMPOSITION AND PREPREG AND METAL FOIL CLAD LAMINATE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORISHITA, Koji c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Techno Park 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 02 /
KOIZUMI, Kaoru c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Techno Park 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 03 /
TAKADA, Keisuke c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Techno Park 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/09] |
Former [2014/15] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12793957.7 | 16.05.2012 | [2019/09] | WO2012JP62516 | Priority number, date | JP20110121924 | 31.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011121924 | [2014/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012165147 | Date: | 06.12.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2716710 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2716710 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08L63/00, C08G59/20, C08J5/24, C08K3/22, C08L79/08, H05K1/03 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
C09D179/08 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (KR);
B32B15/092 (KR,US);
B32B27/38 (US);
C08G73/0644 (EP,US);
C08G73/0655 (KR);
C08G73/1085 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/24 (KR);
C08J5/244 (EP,US);
C08J5/249 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (KR);
C08K9/02 (KR);
C08L79/08 (KR);
C09D183/06 (EP,US);
H05K1/0353 (EP,US);
H05K1/0373 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2379/04 (EP,US);
C08J2379/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2383/04 (KR);
C08J2383/06 (EP,US);
C08J2479/08 (KR);
C08J2483/04 (KR);
C08K2003/2241 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2201/003 (KR);
H05K1/0366 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0209 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D179/08, C08K3/22, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C09D179/08, C08K9/02, C08L83/04 (US,EP);
C09D183/06, C08K2003/2241, C08L79/08 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG SOWIE PREPREG UND METALLFOLIENBESCHICHTUNGSSTOFF DAMIT | [2014/15] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION AND PREPREG AND METAL FOIL CLAD LAMINATE USING SAME | [2014/15] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE ET STRATIFIÉ PRÉ-IMPRÉGNÉ ET REVÊTEMENT DE FEUILLE MÉTALLIQUE L'UTILISANT | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2013 | Translation filed | 27.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 19.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2018 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2012 | AL | 27.02.2019 | AT | 27.02.2019 | CY | 27.02.2019 | CZ | 27.02.2019 | DK | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | ES | 27.02.2019 | FI | 27.02.2019 | HR | 27.02.2019 | LT | 27.02.2019 | LV | 27.02.2019 | MC | 27.02.2019 | MK | 27.02.2019 | MT | 27.02.2019 | PL | 27.02.2019 | RO | 27.02.2019 | RS | 27.02.2019 | SE | 27.02.2019 | SI | 27.02.2019 | SK | 27.02.2019 | SM | 27.02.2019 | TR | 27.02.2019 | IE | 16.05.2019 | LU | 16.05.2019 | BG | 27.05.2019 | NO | 27.05.2019 | GR | 28.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | IS | 27.06.2019 | PT | 27.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 16.05.2012 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
MT | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.05.2012 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 27.02.2019 | |
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.02.2019 | |
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPS6121139 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [Y]JPH02155950 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO); | [Y]WO2004072150 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007138002 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2007231125 (KANEKA CORP); | [A]JP2008094927 (KANEKA CORP); | [Y]JP2008274004 (KANEKA CORP); | [Y]JP2008297536 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [Y]WO2009078129 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2010037442 (SEKISUI PLASTICS); | [Y]JP2011005714 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2011035110 (KANEKA CORP); | [Y]JP2011093966 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD); | [Y] - "Data Sheet W216, BYK Japan Kabushiki Kaisha", DISPERBYK-110, DISPERBYK-11, (2008), URL: http://www.byk.co.jp/datasheet/data/pdf/W216.pdf, (20120803), XP008173865 | [Y] - "Data Sheet W208, BYK Japan Kabushiki Kaisha", DISPERBYK-180, (2008), URL: http://www.byk.co.jp/datasheet/data/pdf/W208.pdf, (20120803), XP055157810 | [Y] - "Data Sheet W510, BYK Japan Kabushiki Kaisha", BYK-W996, (2008), URL: http://www.byk.co.jp/datasheet/data/pdf/W510_.pdf, (20120803), XP008173866 | [Y] - "Data Sheet W508, BYK Japan Kabushiki Kaisha", BYK-W903, (2008), URL: http://www.byk.co.jp/datasheet/data/pdf/W508.pdf, (20120803), XP008173867 | by applicant | JPH10202789 | JP2008001880 | JP2010089493 | JP2011121924 |