EP2776306 - CHASSIS FOR A ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Logistics Wash Holding AG Cysatstraße 21 6004 Luzern / CH | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEDERBERGER, Anton Schinhaltenstr. 20a CH-6370 Oberdorf (NW) / CH | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | Weissfloh, Ingo Prellerstrasse 26 01309 Dresden / DE | [2014/38] | Application number, filing date | 12795355.2 | 06.11.2012 | [2016/11] | WO2012EP71907 | Priority number, date | CH20110001789 | 07.11.2011 Original published format: CH 17892011 | [2014/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013068336 | Date: | 16.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2776306 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2776306 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/265, B62D57/024 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
B62D55/265 (EP,US);
B62D57/024 (EP,US);
Y10S901/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRWERK FÜR EINEN ROBOTER | [2014/38] | English: | CHASSIS FOR A ROBOT | [2014/38] | French: | CHÂSSIS POUR ROBOT | [2014/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 28.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.01.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2012 | AL | 16.03.2016 | CY | 16.03.2016 | CZ | 16.03.2016 | DK | 16.03.2016 | EE | 16.03.2016 | ES | 16.03.2016 | FI | 16.03.2016 | HR | 16.03.2016 | IT | 16.03.2016 | LT | 16.03.2016 | LV | 16.03.2016 | MC | 16.03.2016 | MK | 16.03.2016 | MT | 16.03.2016 | NL | 16.03.2016 | PL | 16.03.2016 | RO | 16.03.2016 | RS | 16.03.2016 | SE | 16.03.2016 | SI | 16.03.2016 | SK | 16.03.2016 | SM | 16.03.2016 | TR | 16.03.2016 | BG | 16.06.2016 | NO | 16.06.2016 | GR | 17.06.2016 | IS | 16.07.2016 | PT | 18.07.2016 | GB | 06.11.2016 | IE | 06.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | FR | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 06.11.2012 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
MT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
GB | 06.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 06.11.2012 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
MT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
GB | 06.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/34] | HU | 06.11.2012 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
GB | 06.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 06.11.2012 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
GB | 06.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
GB | 06.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
IE | 06.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE10320570 (UNIQUE CLEANING SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * figures 1,6; claims 1-3,8 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * | by applicant | DE10320570 |