EP2717912 - ANTI-CD22 ANTIGEN BINDING MOLECULES TO TREAT LUNG CANCER AND PROSTATE CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUSCANO, Joseph 452 Trowbridge Lane Folsom California 95630 / US | 02 /
O'DONNELL, Robert 2034 University Park Drive Sacramento California 95825 / US | [2015/01] |
Former [2014/16] | 01 /
TUSCANO, Joseph 452 Trowbridge Lane Folsom, California 95630 / US | ||
02 /
O'DONNELL, Robert 2034 University Park Drive Sacramento, California 95825 / US | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12796440.1 | 08.06.2012 | WO2012US41500 | Priority number, date | US201161494758P | 08.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161494758 P | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012170785 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2717912 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 13.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K9/127, A61P35/00 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K16/3023 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/1271 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Title | German: | ANTI-CD22-ANTIGENBINDENDE MOLEKÜLE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON LUNGENKREBS UND PROSTATAKREBS | [2014/16] | English: | ANTI-CD22 ANTIGEN BINDING MOLECULES TO TREAT LUNG CANCER AND PROSTATE CANCER | [2014/16] | French: | MOLÉCULES DE LIAISON À UN ANTIGÈNE ANTI-CD22 POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DU POUMON ET DU CANCER DE LA PROSTATE | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 15.09.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 02.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/22] | 27.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/22] | Request for further processing for: | 24.11.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 24.11.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.12.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - TUSCANO J M ET AL, "Anti-CD22 ligand-blocking antibody HB22.7 has independent lymphomacidal properties and augments the efficacy of 90Y-DOTA-peptide-Lym-1 in lymphoma xenografts", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, vol. 101, no. 9, doi:10.1182/BLOOD-2002-08-2629, ISSN 0006-4971, (20030501), pages 3641 - 3647, (20030102), XP002540281 [X] 1,5-9,12-15 * page 3641 * * abstract * * page 3642, column r, paragraph 2 * [I] 10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2002-08-2629 | [A] - JOHNSON J R ET AL, "Approval summary for erlotinib for treatment of patients with locally advanced or metastatic non-small cell lung cancer after failure of at least one prior chemotherapy regimen", EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20050915), Database accession no. EMB-2005424758, XP002736611 [A] 2 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-05-0790 | [ ] - JOHNSON J R ET AL, "Approval summary for erlotinib for treatment of patients with locally advanced or metastatic non-small cell lung cancer after failure of at least one prior chemotherapy regimen", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH 20050915 US, (20050915), vol. 11, no. 18, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 6414 - 6421 | [T] - POP LAURENTIU M ET AL, "A Reevaluation of CD22 Expression in Human Lung Cancer", CANCER RESEARCH, (201401), vol. 74, no. 1, pages 263 - 271, XP002736612 [T] * page 266; table 1 * * page 267; figure 2 * * page 268; figure 3 * * page 267, paragraph l - page 268, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-13-1436 | [T] - TUSCANO JOSEPH M ET AL, "CD22 antigen is broadly expressed on lung cancer cells and is a target for antibody-based therapy.", CANCER RESEARCH 1 NOV 2012, (20121101), vol. 72, no. 21, ISSN 1538-7445, pages 5556 - 5565, XP002736613 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-12-0173 | International search | [X]US2007258981 (HILBERT DAVID M [US], et al); | [Y] - POPOVSKAYA T.N. ET AL., "Targentnaya terapiya - novoe napravlenie lekarstvennogo lecheniya zlokachestvennykh opukholey.", MEZHDUNARODNY MEDITSINSKIY ZHURNAL, (2005), no. 2, pages 105 - 108, XP008172646 | [Y] - JOSEPH M. TUSCANO ET AL., "Anti-CD22 ligand-blocking antibody HB22.7 has independent lymphomacidal properties and augments the efficacy of 90 Y-DOTA- peptide-Lym-1 in lymphoma xenografts.", BLOOD, (20030501), vol. 101, no. 9, pages 3641 - 3647, XP002540281 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2002-08-2629 |