EP2718904 - ADDING ATTRIBUTES TO VIRTUAL REPRESENTATIONS OF REAL-WORLD OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/17] |
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WRIGHT, Shawn C. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
EVERTT, Jeffrey Jesus c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
CLARK, Justin Avram c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
WILLOUGHBY, Christopher Harley c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
SCAVEZZE, Mike c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
SPALDING, Michael A. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 07 /
GEISNER, Kevin c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 08 /
OSBORN, Daniel L. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Germany LLP IP Rosental 4 80331 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 12797196.8 | 05.06.2012 | WO2012US40952 | Priority number, date | US201161493859P | 06.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161493859 P | US201113186666 | 20.07.2011 Original published format: US201113186666 | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012170444 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2718904 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06T19/20 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
G06T19/20 (EP,US);
G06T7/00 (KR);
G06T17/00 (KR);
G06T2219/2012 (EP,US);
G06T2219/2021 (EP,US);
G06T2219/2024 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/16] | G06T17/00, G06T7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Title | German: | HINZUFÜGUNG VON ATTRIBUTEN ZU VIRTUELLEN DARSTELLUNGEN VON OBJEKTEN AUS DER ECHTEN WELT | [2014/16] | English: | ADDING ATTRIBUTES TO VIRTUAL REPRESENTATIONS OF REAL-WORLD OBJECTS | [2014/16] | French: | AJOUT D'ATTRIBUTS À DES REPRÉSENTATIONS VIRTUELLES D'OBJETS DU MONDE RÉEL | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 14.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/09] | 23.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - Christian Eckes ET AL, ""Virtual Human" Anthropomorphe Interaktionsagenten", (20060516), pages 1 - 57, URL: http://www.virtual-human.org/Vortraege/VH_OVERVIEW_2006.pdf, (20140731), XP055132732 [Y] 1-9 * pages 19, 20, 22, 41, 53, 54 * | [Y] - Anonymous, "EA Forums - Suggested attributes f or a FIFA 10 style training system", (20101106), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://forum.ea.com/eaforum/posts/list/856106.page, (20140731), XP055132729 [Y] 1-9 * comment of Andi Miller 31; page 1 * | International search | [Y]US2010302247 (PEREZ KATHRYN STONE [US], et al); | [Y]US2009164505 (TUDOSE RADU [DE]); | [A]JP2002288687 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]US2008274805 (GANZ HOWARD [CA], et al); | [A]KR20080034419 (YAPPA CORP [JP]) | by applicant | - CHRISTIAN ECKES, "Virtual Human", ANTHROPOMORPHE INTERAKTIONSAGENTEN |