EP2777108 - MODE-LOCKED SEMICONDUCTOR LASER DIODE WITH DISPERSION-COMPENSATED EXTERNAL CAVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONO, Shunsuke c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
KURAMOTO, Masaru c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
MIYAJIMA, Takao c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
KODA, Rintaro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 05 /
WATANABE, Hideki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12798000.1 | 09.11.2012 | WO2012JP07207 | Priority number, date | JP20110247276 | 11.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011247276 | [2014/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013069301 | Date: | 16.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2777108 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/065, H01S5/14, H01S5/00, H01S5/343 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
H01S5/141 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01S5/0657 (EP,US);
H01S5/143 (EP,US);
H01S3/08004 (EP,US);
H01S3/08009 (EP,US);
H01S3/105 (EP,US);
H01S3/106 (EP,US);
H01S3/1062 (EP,US);
H01S5/0014 (EP,US);
H01S5/0265 (EP,US);
H01S5/101 (EP,US);
H01S5/22 (EP,US);
H01S5/3063 (EP,US);
H01S5/3216 (EP,US);
H01S5/34333 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Title | German: | MODENGEKOPPELTE HALBLEITERLASERDIODE MIT DISPERSIONSKOMPENSIERTEM EXTERNEM RESONATOR | [2014/38] | English: | MODE-LOCKED SEMICONDUCTOR LASER DIODE WITH DISPERSION-COMPENSATED EXTERNAL CAVITY | [2014/38] | French: | DIODE LASER À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR À MODES BLOQUÉS AVEC CAVITÉ EXTERNE À COMPENSATION DE DISPERSION | [2014/38] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 27.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/31] | 27.01.2015 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 03.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2015/31] | 03.03.2015 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2004190567 (LUTGEN STEPHAN [DE] ET AL) [I] 1-19 * fig.1-5; §22, §83 *; | [ID] - TOBIAS SCHLAUCH ET AL, "Femtosecond passively modelocked diode laser with intracavity dispersion management", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20101108), vol. 18, no. 23, doi:10.1364/OE.18.024316, ISSN 1094-4087, page 24316, XP055057805 [ID] 1-19 * fig.1, p.24318, p.24322, p.24324, whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.18.024316 | [I] - DELFYETT P J; FLOREZ L; STOFFEL N; GMITTER T; ANDREADAKIS N; ALPHONSE G A, "Generation of high-power femtosecond optical pulses from a semiconductor diode laser system", OSA PICOSECOND ELECTRONICS AND OPTOELECTRONICS, (1991), XP009168404 [I] 1-19 * ab. fig.1 p.186 * | [IP] - KONO SHUNSUKE ET AL, "200-fs pulse generation from a GaInN semiconductor laser diode passively mode-locked in a dispersion-compensated external cavity", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, vol. 101, no. 8, doi:10.1063/1.4747808, ISSN 0003-6951, (20120820), pages 81121 - 81121, (20120824), XP012164796 [IP] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.4747808 | by applicant | - SCHLAUCH ET AL., OPTICS EXPRESS, (2010), vol. 18, page 24136 | - YARIV, Introduction to Optical Electronics, MARUZEN CO., LTD., pages 183 - 196 | - VASIL'EV, Ultrafast diode lasers, ARTECH HOUSE, pages 39 - 43 |