EP2783491 - HYBRID NETWORKING PATH SELECTION AND LOAD BALANCING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/40] | PROVIDING PATH INFORMATION IN MIXED COMMUNICATION NETWORKS | ||
[2018/51] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2014/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Etan Gur c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
ZHAO, Yili c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
RYAN, Michael B. c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
SHALOM, Hai c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 05 /
COWAN, Anthony J. c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2014/40] | Application number, filing date | 12798112.4 | 20.11.2012 | WO2012US66109 | Priority number, date | US201113301576 | 21.11.2011 Original published format: US201113301576 | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013078228 | Date: | 30.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2783491 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/729 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
H04L45/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Title | German: | HYBRID-NETZWERKPFADAUSWAHL UND LASTAUSGLEICH | [2018/51] | English: | HYBRID NETWORKING PATH SELECTION AND LOAD BALANCING | [2018/51] | French: | SÉLECTION DU CHEMIN EN RÉSEAU HYBRIDE ET ÉQUILIBRAGE DE CHARGE | [2018/51] |
Former [2014/40] | BEREITSTELLUNG VON PFADINFORMATIONEN IN GEMISCHTEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZEN | ||
Former [2014/40] | PROVIDING PATH INFORMATION IN MIXED COMMUNICATION NETWORKS | ||
Former [2014/40] | FOURNITURE D'INFORMATIONS DE TRAJET DANS DES RÉSEAUX DE COMMUNICATION MIXTES | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 22.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 16.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1786151 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [X] 1-22 * the whole document * [I] 23-26; | [X]EP2061211 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 23-26* figure 1 * |