EP2750822 - METHOD FOR CONNECTING WORKPIECES AND CONNECTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2014/28] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUSSLER, Johann Äussere Ringstraße 12 92521 Schwarzenfeld / DE | [2014/28] | Application number, filing date | 12798209.8 | 21.11.2012 | WO2012EP73200 | Priority number, date | DE20111089282 | 20.12.2011 Original published format: DE102011089282 | DE201210212202 | 12.07.2012 Original published format: DE102012212202 | [2014/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013092083 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2750822 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/00 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
B23K1/0004 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN UND VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/28] | English: | METHOD FOR CONNECTING WORKPIECES AND CONNECTING DEVICE | [2014/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ASSEMBLAGE DE PIÈCES | [2014/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 26.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 29.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH01249278 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]JPH03470 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [XA]JPH08118039 (NITTO KOGYO KK) [X] 10,11 * abstract * [A] 1-9; | [A] - SITTE G, "PUNKTFOERMIGES WIDERSTANDSLOETEN", PRAKTIKER: SCHWEISSTECHNIK UND MEHR, DVS VERLAG, DUESSELDORF, DE, (20010501), vol. 53, no. 5, ISSN 0554-9965, pages 196 - 198, XP001112982 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |