EP2790858 - METHOD FOR ADDITIVELY MANUFACTURING AN ARTICLE MADE OF A DIFFICULT-TO-WELD MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ansaldo Energia IP UK Limited 5th Floor, North Side 7/10 Chandos Street Cavendish Square London W1G 9DQ / GB | [2017/22] |
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd. Brown Boveri Str. 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICKENBACHER, Lukas Emanuel Dornacherstrasse 73 CH-4053 Basel / CH | 02 /
STANKOWSKI, Alexander Mittelgasse 17 CH-5303 Würenlingen / CH | 03 /
HOEVEL, Simone Schulstrasse 24 CH-5426 Lengnau / CH | 04 /
ETTER, Thomas Kornweg 18 CH-5037 Muhen / CH | [2014/45] |
Former [2014/43] | 01 /
RICKENBACHER, Lukas Emanuel Dornacherstrasse 73 CH-4053 Basel / CH | ||
02 /
STANKOWSKI, Alexander Mittelgasse 17 CH-5303 Würenlingen / CH | |||
03 /
HOEVEL, Simone Höhtalstrasse 85 CH-5408 Ennetbaden / CH | |||
04 /
ETTER, Thomas Kornweg 18 CH-5037 Muhen / CH | Representative(s) | Bernotti, Andrea, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2017/06] | Application number, filing date | 12798286.6 | 06.12.2012 | [2017/06] | WO2012EP74677 | Priority number, date | CH20110001980 | 14.12.2011 Original published format: CH 19802011 | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013087515 | Date: | 20.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2790858 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2790858 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C22C19/03, B22F1/00, B22F3/105, B22F3/15, B22F3/24, C22C19/05, C22C19/07, B32B15/01, C23C24/08, C23C24/10 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
B32B15/01 (EP,US);
B22D23/02 (EP,US);
B22F1/052 (EP,US);
B22F10/25 (EP,US);
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B22F10/34 (EP,US);
B22F10/64 (EP,US);
B22F3/15 (EP,US);
B22F3/24 (EP,US);
B23K15/0086 (US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
C22C19/007 (EP,US);
C22C19/057 (EP,US);
C22C19/07 (EP,US);
C23C24/085 (EP,US);
C23C24/106 (EP,US);
B22F10/366 (EP,US);
B22F12/17 (EP,US);
B22F12/41 (EP,US);
B22F12/45 (EP,US);
B22F2003/248 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/43] | B22F3/105, C22C19/03, C22C19/07, C22C19/05, B32B15/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GENERATIVEN HERSTELLUNG EINES ARTIKELS AUS SCHWER ZU SCHWEISSENDEM MATERIAL | [2016/36] | English: | METHOD FOR ADDITIVELY MANUFACTURING AN ARTICLE MADE OF A DIFFICULT-TO-WELD MATERIAL | [2014/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE D'UN ARTICLE COMPOSÉ D'UN MATÉRIAU DIFFICILE À SOUDER | [2014/43] |
Former [2014/43] | VERFAHREN ZUR ZUSÄTZLICHEN HERSTELLUNG EINES ARTIKELS AUS SCHWER ZU SCHWEISSENDEM MATERIAL | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 20.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2012 | AL | 08.02.2017 | AT | 08.02.2017 | CY | 08.02.2017 | CZ | 08.02.2017 | DK | 08.02.2017 | EE | 08.02.2017 | ES | 08.02.2017 | FI | 08.02.2017 | HR | 08.02.2017 | LT | 08.02.2017 | LV | 08.02.2017 | MC | 08.02.2017 | MK | 08.02.2017 | NL | 08.02.2017 | PL | 08.02.2017 | RO | 08.02.2017 | RS | 08.02.2017 | SE | 08.02.2017 | SI | 08.02.2017 | SK | 08.02.2017 | SM | 08.02.2017 | TR | 08.02.2017 | BG | 08.05.2017 | NO | 08.05.2017 | GR | 09.05.2017 | IS | 08.06.2017 | PT | 08.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 06.12.2012 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
MK | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
TR | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 06.12.2012 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
MK | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 06.12.2012 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.12.2012 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004007124 (EXTRUDE HONE CORP [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1396556 (ALSTOM SWITZERLAND LTD [CH]) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2005028690 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH], et al) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [XDI] - KELBASSA I ET AL, "Manufacture and repair of aero engine components using laser technology", 3RD PACIFIC INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON APPLICATIONS OF LASERS AND OPTICS, PICALO : APRIL 16 - 18, 2008, CAPITAL HOTEL, BEIJING, CHINA ; SESSIONS FEATURING: PLENARY SESSION, LASER MATERIALS PROCESSING CONFERENCE, MICRO, NANO & ULTRAFAST FABRICATION C, (20080101), ISBN 978-0-912035-89-5, pages 208 - 213, XP009161890 [XD] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-19 | [A] - LIN X ET AL, "Laser rapid forming of SS316L/Rene88DT graded material", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING A: STRUCTURAL MATERIALS:PROPERTIES, MICROSTRUCTURE & PROCESSING, LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 391, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.MSEA.2004.08.072, ISSN 0921-5093, (20050125), pages 325 - 336, (20050125), XP025303281 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.msea.2004.08.072 | by applicant | US6215093 | DE10104732 | US6621039 | WO2004007124 | EP1689897 | - B. GEDDES; H. LEON; X. HUANG, "Superalloys, Alloying and performance", ASM INTERNATIONAL, (2010), pages 71 - 72 | - MUMTAZ, K.; N. HOPKINSON, "Top surface and side roughness of Inconel 625 parts processed using selective laser melting", RAPID PROTOTYPING JOURNAL, (2009), vol. 15, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1108/13552540910943397, pages 96 - 103, XP009161885 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1108/13552540910943397 | - MUMTAZ, K.; N. HOPKINSON, "Laser melting functionally graded composition of Waspaloy® and Zirconia powders", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 42, no. 18, doi:doi:10.1007/s10853-007-1661-3, pages 7647 - 7656, XP019528803 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10853-007-1661-3 | - MUMTAZ, K.A.; P. ERASENTHIRAN; N. HOPKINSON, "High density selective laser melting of Waspaloy®", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS PROCESSING TECHNOLOGY, (2008), vol. 195, no. 1-3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jmatprotec.2007.04.117, pages 77 - 87, XP022370845 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmatprotec.2007.04.117 | - KELBASSA, I. ET AL., "Manufacture and repair of aero engine components using laser technology", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3RD PACIFIC INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON APPLICATION OF LASERS AND OPTICS, (2008), page 211 |