EP2794856 - INDUCED PLURIPOTENT STEM CELLS PREPARED FROM HUMAN KIDNEY-DERIVED CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Synthes Products, LLC 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767 / US | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUENSUCESO, Charito 11 Petunia Drive Apt. 1J North Brunswick, New Jersey 08902 / US | 02 /
SEYDA, Agnieszka 70 De Hart Drive Belle Mead, New Jersey 08502 / US | 03 /
COLTER, David C. 208 Irvington Place Hamilton, New Jersey 08610 / US | 04 /
DHANARAJ, Sridevi 3 Roderer Drive Raritan, New Jersey 08869 / US | 05 /
KRAMER, Brian C. 205 Pemberton Avenue Plainfield, New Jersey 07060 / US | 06 /
EKERT, Jason Elliot 2437 Norrington Drive Jeffersonville, Pennsylvania 19403 / US | 07 /
KAUFFMAN, Amanda Lynn 591 Elbridge Road Morrisville, Pennsylvania 19067 / US | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Kirsch, Susan Edith Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/44] | Application number, filing date | 12799035.6 | 04.12.2012 | WO2012US67725 | Priority number, date | US201113331283 | 20.12.2011 Original published format: US201113331283 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013095910 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2794856 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0735 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
C12N5/0696 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (US);
C12N2501/602 (EP,US);
C12N2501/603 (EP,US);
C12N2501/604 (EP,US);
C12N2501/606 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Title | German: | INDUZIERTE PLURIPOTENTE STAMMZELLEN AUS MENSCHLICHEN AUS NIEREN GEWONNENEN ZELLEN | [2014/44] | English: | INDUCED PLURIPOTENT STEM CELLS PREPARED FROM HUMAN KIDNEY-DERIVED CELLS | [2014/44] | French: | CELLULES SOUCHES PLURIPOTENTES INDUITES PRÉPARÉES À PARTIR DE CELLULES ISSUES DE REIN HUMAIN | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 17.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/28] | 09.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2008045498 (ETHICON INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 12 * * page 8, paragraph 26 - page 9, paragraph 27 * * page 57; claims 1,3 * [Y] 6-8; | [I]WO2009102983 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 2, line 7 - line 8 * * page 5, line 11 - line 14 * * page 15, paragraph 1 * * page 39, paragraph l * * page 50, paragraph 2 *; | [I]WO2009152529 (WHITEHEAD BIOMEDICAL INST [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 14 - line 25 * * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 2 * * page 7, line 21 - line 24 * * page 12, line 23 - line 33 * * page 32, line 19 - line 25 * * page 34, line 13 - line 21 * * page 36; example 1 * * page 46, line 1 - line 19 * * page 50, line 9 - line 14 * * page 74, line 12 - line 28 * * page 75, line 10 - line 18 *; | [Y] - LUIGI WARREN ET AL, "Highly efficient reprogramming to pluripotency and directed differentiation of human cells with synthetic modified mRNA", CELL STEM CELL, CELL PRESS, US, vol. 7, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.STEM.2010.08.012, ISSN 1934-5909, (20101105), pages 618 - 630, (20100930), XP002640639 [Y] 6-8 * abstract * * page 618, column r * * page 621, column l, paragraph l - page 623, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.STEM.2010.08.012 | by applicant | US2008112939 | - TAKAHASHI, K.; YAMANAKA, S., CELL, (2006), vol. 126, pages 663 - 76 | - TAKAHASHI, K. ET AL., CELL, (2007), vol. 131, pages 861 - 72 | - HOCHEDLINGER, K., PLATH, K., DEVELOPMENT, (2009), vol. 136, pages 509 - 23 | - LOWRY, W. E. ET AL., PROC NATLACAD SCI USA, (2008), vol. 105, pages 2883 - 8 | - LOWRY, W. E., PROC NATLACAD SCI USA, (2008), vol. 105, pages 2883 - 8 | - SILVA, J. ET AL., PLOS BIOL, (2008), vol. 6, page E253 | - EMINLI, S. ET AL., STEM CELLS, (2008), vol. 26, pages 2467 - 74 | - KIM, J. B. ET AL., CELL, (2009), vol. 136, pages 411 - 9 | - KIM, J. B. ET AL., NATURE, (2008), vol. 454, pages 646 - 50 | - ZHAO Y ET AL., CELL STEM CELL, (2008), vol. 3, pages 475 - 479 | - SARIG, R. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (2010), vol. 207, pages 2127 - 2140 | - HAY, D. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (2008), vol. 105, no. 34, pages 12301 - 6 | - VODYANIK, M.A.; SLUVIN, Curr Protoc Cell Biol, (2007), vol. 11 | - D'AMOUR, K. A. ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2005), vol. 23, no. 12, pages 1534 - 1541 | - SPENCE, J. R. ET AL., NATURE, (2011), vol. 470, no. 7332, pages 105 - 109 | - HUANG, P. ET AL., NATURE, (2011), vol. 475, pages 386 - 389 |