EP2783214 - PROTEOMIC IDENTIFICATION OF ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Regents of The University of Texas System 201 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | [2014/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAVINDER, Jason c/o The University of Texas at Austin 1 University Station C0800 Austin, TX 78712-6975 / US | 02 /
WINE, Yariv c/o The University of Texas at Austin 1 University Station C0800 Austin, TX 78712-6975 / US | 03 /
BOUTZ, Danny c/o The University of Texas at Austin 1 University Station C0800 Austin, TX 78712-6975 / US | 04 /
MARCOTTE, Edward c/o The University of Texas at Austin 1 University Station C0800 Austin, TX 78712-6975 / US | 05 /
GEORGIOU, George c/o The University of Texas at Austin 1 University Station C0800 Austin, TX 78712-6975 / US | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Callaghan, Dayle Anne Rouse IP Limited 11th Floor, Exchange Tower 1 Harbour Exchange Square London E14 9GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 12799408.5 | 23.11.2012 | WO2012US66454 | Priority number, date | US201161563380P | 23.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161563380 P | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013078455 | Date: | 30.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2783214 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/531, G01N33/68 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
G01N33/6857 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6874 (US);
G01N33/531 (EP,US);
G01N33/6848 (EP,US);
G01N33/6854 (EP,US);
C40B30/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Title | German: | PROTEOMISCHER NACHWEIS VON ANTIKÖRPERN | [2014/40] | English: | PROTEOMIC IDENTIFICATION OF ANTIBODIES | [2014/40] | French: | IDENTIFICATION PROTÉOMIQUE D'ANTICORPS | [2014/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 12.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/07] | 12.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO2011146514 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [XP] 1-24,48-57 * the whole document *; | [I] - REDDY SAI T ET AL, "Monoclonal antibodies isolated without screening by analyzing the variable-gene repertoire of plasma cells", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (201009), vol. 28, no. 9, ISSN 1087-0156, page 965, XP002693037 [I] 1-24,48-57 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1673 | [I] - FISCHER NICOLAS, "Sequencing antibody repertoires The next generation", MABS, (201101), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 17 - 20, XP002693038 [I] 1-24,48-57 * abstr, fig 1; p 19, col 1, para 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.3.1.14169 | [A] - NAZABAL A ET AL, "Immunoassays with direct mass spectrometric detection", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20060601), vol. 78, no. 11, doi:10.1021/AC0519108, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 3562 - 3570, XP002438305 [A] 1-24,48-57 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac0519108 | [Y] - RAVETCH J V ET AL, "STRUCTURE OF THE HUMAN IMMUNOGLOBULIN MU LOCUS: CHARACTERIZATION OFEMBRYONIC AND REARRANGED J AND D GENES", CELL, CELL PRESS, US, (19811201), vol. 27, no. IT-02, doi:10.1016/0092-8674(81)90400-1, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 583 - 591, XP000925548 [Y] 25-47 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(81)90400-1 | [Y] - WILLIS T G ET AL, "Rapid molecular cloning of rearrangements of the IGHJ locus using long-distance inverse polymerase chain reaction", BLOOD, (1997), vol. 90, no. 6, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2456 - 2464, XP002701130 [Y] 25-47 * abstract * | [XP] - WAN CHEUNG CHEUNG ET AL, "A proteomics approach for the identification and cloning of monoclonal antibodies from serum", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20120101), doi:10.1038/nbt.2167, ISSN 1087-0156, XP055026189 [XP] 1-24,48-57 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2167 | [XP] - SHUJI SATO ET AL, "Proteomics-directed cloning of circulating antiviral human monoclonal antibodies", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20121101), vol. 30, no. 11, doi:10.1038/nbt.2406, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1039 - 1043, XP055054091 [XP] 1-24,48-57 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2406 | [XP] - ALESSIO MAIOLICA ET AL, "Targeted proteome investigation via selected reaction monitoring mass spectrometry", JOURNAL OF PROTEOMICS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 75, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.JPROT.2012.04.048, ISSN 1874-3919, (20120429), pages 3495 - 3513, (20120508), XP028430290 [XP] 1-24,48-57 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jprot.2012.04.048 | [T] - Y. WINE ET AL, "Molecular deconvolution of the monoclonal antibodies that comprise the polyclonal serum response", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20130219), vol. 110, no. 8, doi:10.1073/pnas.1213737110, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2993 - 2998, XP055054078 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1213737110 | [T] - BRANDON J DEKOSKY ET AL, "High-throughput sequencing of the paired human immunoglobulin heavy and light chain repertoire", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20130101), vol. 31, no. 2, doi:10.1038/nbt.2492, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 166 - 169, XP055054081 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2492 | [IP] - H. MOUQUET ET AL, "PNAS Plus: Complex-type N-glycan recognition by potent broadly neutralizing HIV antibodies", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20121120), vol. 109, no. 47, doi:10.1073/pnas.1217207109, ISSN 0027-8424, pages E3268 - E3277, XP055068116 [IP] 1-57 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1217207109 | [IP] - IPPOLITO GREGORY C ET AL, "Antibody Repertoires in Humanized NOD-scid-IL2R gamma(null) Mice and Human B Cells Reveals Human-Like Diversification and Tolerance Checkpoints in the Mouse", PLOS ONE, (201204), vol. 7, no. 4, XP002701124 [IP] 1-57 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0035497 | by applicant | EP0239400 | EP0171496 | EP0173494 | EP0194276 | WO8901782 | WO8901974 | WO8902465 | US8043621 | - BROWNING ET AL., NATURE, (1955), vol. 175, pages 570 - 575 | - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - COBAUGH ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2008), vol. 378, no. 3, pages 622 - 633 | - COX ET AL., PROTEIN SCI., (2007), vol. 16, pages 379 - 390 | - DE COSTA ET AL., J. PROTEOME RES., (2010), vol. 9, pages 2937 - 2945 | - DEKKER ET AL., ANALY. BIOANALYT. CHEM., (2011), vol. 399, pages 1081 - 1091 | - FELDHAUS ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2003), vol. 21, pages 163 - 170 | - FOX ET AL., METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2009), vol. 553, pages 79 - 108 | - GAO ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2003), vol. 31, page E143 | - GIBSON ET AL., "Enzymatic assembly of DNA molecules up to several hundred kilobases", NAT. METHODS., (2009), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1038/nmeth.1318, pages 343 - 345, XP055224105 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.1318 | - HARLOW; LANE, Antibodies: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, (1988), pages 346 - 348 | - HARVEY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2004), vol. 101, pages 9193 - 9198 | - HAYHURST ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2003), vol. 276, pages 185 - 196 | - HOOGENBOOM, NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 23, pages 1105 - 1116 | - HOSSE ET AL., PROTEIN SCI., (2006), vol. 15, pages 14 - 27 | - HU ET AL., J. MASS. SPECTROM., (2005), vol. 40, pages 430 - 443 | - HUNT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 6233 - 6237 | - IPPOLITO ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, no. 4, page E35497 | - ISHIHAMA ET AL., MOL. CELL PROTEOMICS, (2005), vol. 4, pages 1265 - 1272 | - JACKSON ET AL., ADV. IMMUNOL., (2008), vol. 98, pages 151 - 224 | - JIN ET AL., NAT. MED., (2009), vol. 15, pages 1088 - 1092 | - KANTHA, J. MED., (1991), vol. 40, pages 35 - 39 | - KELLER ET AL., ANAL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 74, pages 5383 - 5392 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - KREBBER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1997), vol. 201, pages 35 - 55 | - KRETZSCHMAR; VON RUDEN, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECH., (2002), vol. 13, pages 598 - 602 | - KWAKKENBOS ET AL., NAT. MED., (2010), vol. 16, pages 123 - 128 | - LINK ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 17, pages 676 - 682 | - LIU ET AL., ANAL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 76, pages 4193 - 4201 | - LOVE ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2006), vol. 24, pages 703 - 707 | - LU ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2007), vol. 25, pages 117 - 124 | - MALMSTROEM ET AL., NATURE, (2009), vol. 460, pages 762 - U112 | - MALMSTROM ET AL., NATURE, (2009), vol. 460, no. 7256, pages 762 - 5 | - MARCOTTE, NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2007), vol. 25, pages 755 - 757 | - MAZOR ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2007), vol. 321, pages 41 - 59 | - MAZOR ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2007), vol. 25, pages 563 - 565 | - MEIJER ET AL., J MOLEC. BIOL., (2006), vol. 358, pages 764 - 772 | - NESVIZHSKII ET AL., ANAL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 75, pages 4646 - 4658 | - OLSEN ET AL., NAT. METHODS, (2007), vol. 4, pages 709 - 712 | - ONG; MANN, NAT. CHEM. BIOL., (2005), vol. 1, pages 252 - 262 | - PANDEY; MANN, NATURE, (2000), vol. 405, pages 837 - 846 | - PERSSON ET AL., J MOL. BIOL., (2006), vol. 357, pages 607 - 20 | - RADBRUCH ET AL., NAT. REV. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 6, pages 741 - 750 | - REDDY ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2010), vol. 28, pages 965 - U920 | - SCHAFFITZEL ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METH., (1999), vol. 231, pages 119 - 135 | - SCHEID ET AL., NATURE, (2009), vol. 458, pages 636 - 640 | - SHEVCHENKO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 14440 - 14445 | - SILVA ET AL., MOL. CELL PROTEOMICS, (2006), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 589 - 607 | - SILVA ET AL., MOL. CELL PROTEOMICS, (2006), vol. 5, pages 144 - 156 | - SMITH ET AL., NAT. PROTOC., (2009), vol. 4, pages 372 - 384 | - TATUSOVA ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL LETT., (1999), vol. 174, no. 2, pages 247 - 50 | - TRAGGIAI ET AL., NAT. MED., (2004), vol. 10, pages 871 - 875 | - VOGEL; MARCOTTE, NATURE PROTOCOLS, (2008), vol. 3, pages 1444 - 1451 | - WASHBURN ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 19, pages 242 - 247 | - WEINSTEIN ET AL., SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 324, pages 807 - 810 | - WRAMMERT ET AL., NATURE, (2008), vol. 453, pages 667 - 671 | - ZAHND ET AL., NAT. METHODS, (2007), vol. 4, pages 269 - 279 |