EP2722912 - COMPOSITION FOR FORMING SECONDARY BATTERY ELECTRODE, SECONDARY BATTERY ELECTRODE, AND SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO., LTD. 7-1, Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8377 / JP | [2014/32] |
Former [2014/17] | For all designated states Toyo Ink SC Holdings Co., Ltd. 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8377 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOROISHI, Yasuyuki TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO., LTD. 7-1, Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8377 / JP | 02 /
SIGEMORI, Kazunori TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO., LTD. 7-1, Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8377 / JP | [2016/13] |
Former [2014/17] | 01 /
MOROISHI, Yasuyuki TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO., LTD. 7-1, Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8377 / JP | ||
02 /
SIGEMORI, Kazunori TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO., LTD. 7-1, Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8377 / JP | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12799865.6 | 11.06.2012 | [2016/13] | WO2012JP64869 | Priority number, date | JP20110133449 | 15.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011133449 | JP20110194606 | 07.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011194606 | [2014/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012173072 | Date: | 20.12.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2722912 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2722912 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/13, H01M4/62, // H01M10/0525 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
H01M4/62 (EP,US);
H01M4/13 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/606 (CN);
H01M4/622 (EP,US);
H01M4/625 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/17] | H01M4/04, H01M4/02, H01M4/13, H01M4/139, H01M4/62, H01M4/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BILDUNG EINER SEKUNDÄRBATTERIENELEKTRODE, SEKUNDÄRBATTERIENELEKTRODE UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2014/17] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR FORMING SECONDARY BATTERY ELECTRODE, SECONDARY BATTERY ELECTRODE, AND SECONDARY BATTERY | [2014/17] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR FORMATION D'ÉLECTRODE D'ACCUMULATEUR, ÉLECTRODE D'ACCUMULATEUR, ET ACCUMULATEUR | [2014/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2014 | Translation filed | 07.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 24.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2012 | AL | 30.03.2016 | AT | 30.03.2016 | BE | 30.03.2016 | BG | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | CZ | 30.03.2016 | DK | 30.03.2016 | EE | 30.03.2016 | FI | 30.03.2016 | HR | 30.03.2016 | IT | 30.03.2016 | LT | 30.03.2016 | LV | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | MK | 30.03.2016 | NL | 30.03.2016 | PL | 30.03.2016 | RO | 30.03.2016 | RS | 30.03.2016 | SE | 30.03.2016 | SI | 30.03.2016 | SK | 30.03.2016 | SM | 30.03.2016 | TR | 30.03.2016 | IE | 11.06.2016 | LU | 11.06.2016 | GB | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | NO | 30.06.2016 | GR | 01.07.2016 | IS | 30.07.2016 | PT | 01.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 11.06.2012 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
BG | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.06.2016 | ||
LU | 11.06.2016 | ||
GB | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 11.06.2012 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.06.2016 | ||
LU | 11.06.2016 | ||
GB | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.06.2012 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.06.2016 | ||
GB | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
IE | 11.06.2016 | ||
GB | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
RS | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004062989 (UENO YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * table 1 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0298] - paragraph [0300] * * paragraphs [0311] , [0316] * * paragraph [0321] - paragraph [0326] *; | [A]US6756153 (YAMAMOTO HARUHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * tables 1,2 * * column 4, line 57 - line 59 * * column 13, line 65 - column 14, line 4 * * column 16, line 46 - line 56 * * column 17, line 50 - line 61 * * column 18, line 59 - line 67 * * column 19, line 32 - line 39 *; | [A]WO2010114119 (TOYO INK MFG CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [P]US2012095131 (KINOSHITA SACHIKO [JP], et al) [P] * As translation * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0131] ** paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0142] * | International search | [A]WO2006118235 (ZEON CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2009176721 (KAO CORP, et al); | [A]JP2009302009 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2010177079 (DAIKIN IND LTD) | Examination | JP2010021059 | by applicant | JPH02158055 | JPH0982364 | JP2003142102 | JP2006516795 | JP2010165493 | JP2011076910 |