EP2701932 - PISTON-TYPE ACTUATOR AND STATIC FLUID DAMPER AND VEHICLES INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Jinghong C/o Honda Patents&Technologies North America LLC 21001 State Route 739 Raymond, OH 43067 / US | 02 /
TOKUNAGA, Hiroyuki C/o Honda Patents&Technologies North America LLC 21001 State Route 739 Raymond, OH 43067 / US | [2014/10] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Feller, Frank Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12800308.4 | 10.04.2012 | WO2012US32883 | Priority number, date | US201113159778 | 14.06.2011 Original published format: US201113159778 | [2014/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012173687 | Date: | 20.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2701932 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/016, B60G17/08, F16F9/46, F16F9/19 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
F16F9/19 (EP,US);
B60G17/0162 (EP,US);
B60G17/08 (EP,US);
F16F9/46 (EP,US);
B60G2500/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/10] | B60G17/0165 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/10] | Title | German: | KOLBENAKTUATOR UND STATISCHER FLUIDDÄMPFER SOWIE FAHRZEUGE DAMIT | [2014/10] | English: | PISTON-TYPE ACTUATOR AND STATIC FLUID DAMPER AND VEHICLES INCLUDING SAME | [2014/10] | French: | ACTIONNEUR DU TYPE À PISTON ET AMORTISSEUR À FLUIDE STATIQUE ET VÉHICULES COMPRENANT CEUX-CI | [2014/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 27.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/03] | 04.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3563566 (WEBER STEVEN L) [A] 1,7-9,12 * column 2, lines 39-44; figure - *; | [XI]US4606551 (TOTI GABRIELE [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-15 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 38; figure - * * column 5, line 44 - line 47 * [I] 5,6,9; | [A]US4787649 (WATANABE KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,6,8,12 * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 42; figures 2-4 *; | [I]US4802561 (KNECHT HEINZ [DE], et al) [I] 1,8,9,11,12,15 * column 6, line 48 - line 58; figures 1-3 *; | [I]US5586627 (NEZU TAKASHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 37, line 25 - column 41, line 17; figures 18,19 *; | [A]GB2346346 (PRODRIVE HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, lines 5-8; figure -; claim 6 ** page 4, lines 16-21 * | International search | [Y]US5082308 (JONES NEIL [US]); | [A]US5653315 (EKQUIST ALAN LESLIE [US], et al); | [A]US2010013174 (BUMA SHUUICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2011025000 (INOUE HIROFUMI [JP], et al) |