EP2721091 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING AMINE-MODIFIED POLYESTER RESINS WITH IMPROVED MELT FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | ||
Former [2014/17] | For all designated states Sabic Innovative Plastics IP BV 1 Plastics Avenue Pittsfield MA 01201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALLUCCI, Robert, Russell 1109 Tanglewood Drive MT. Vernon, IN 47620 / US | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | Stiebe, Lars Magnus, et al Balder Paseo de la Castellana 93, 5 28046 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Stiebe, Lars Magnus, et al Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 120 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 12800763.0 | 16.08.2012 | WO2012US51180 | Priority number, date | US201113163599 | 17.06.2011 Original published format: US201113163599 | [2014/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012174575 | Date: | 20.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2721091 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/91, C08L67/03, C08K5/17, C08G63/183, C08J5/00 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
C08G63/916 (EP,US);
B29C48/0022 (EP,US);
B29C48/04 (EP,US);
B29C48/2886 (EP,US);
B29C48/397 (EP,US);
B29C48/40 (EP);
B29C48/405 (EP);
C08G63/6856 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG AMIN-MODIFIZIERTER POLYESTERHARZE MIT VERBESSERTEM SCHMELZFLUSS | [2014/17] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING AMINE-MODIFIED POLYESTER RESINS WITH IMPROVED MELT FLOW | [2014/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE RÉSINES DE POLYESTER MODIFIÉES PAR UNE AMINE PRÉSENTANT UN FLUAGE À L'ÉTAT FONDU AMÉLIORÉ | [2014/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 05.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/32] | 28.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4193896 (COOK WILLIAM H [US]) [X] 1-26 * claim 1 * * column 3, lines 20-23 ** column 1, lines 61-63 * | International search | [A]US4193896 (COOK WILLIAM H [US]); | [A]US4760100 (MCDANIEL KENNETH G [US]); | [Y]US5120822 (HOESCHELE GUENTHER K [US], et al); | [X]US2007060719 (CLEMENT FLORENCE [FR], et al) | by applicant | US4579906 | US5521230 | US7405250 | US7405249 | US7825176 |