EP2720662 - LIFTING AND TRANSPORTING DEVICE FOR WHEELED OBJECTS INCLUDING HOSPITAL BEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Austech & Design Pty Ltd P.O. Box 1208 Clearview, South Australia 5085 / AU | [2014/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCH, Peter Raymond P.O. Box 1208 Clearview, South Australia 5085 / AU | 02 /
BELL, Kenneth Ian P.O. Box 1208 Clearview, South Australia 5085 / AU | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2014/17] | Ahlskog, Tatu Kari Petteri Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 12800952.9 | 18.06.2012 | [2016/10] | WO2012AU00702 | Priority number, date | AU20110902373 | 17.06.2011 Original published format: AU 2011902373 | AU20110904214 | 12.10.2011 Original published format: AU 2011904214 | [2014/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012171079 | Date: | 20.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2720662 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2720662 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 20.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/08, B66F5/00, B60S13/00, B62B3/02, B62B3/04 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
A61G7/08 (EP,US);
B62B3/0618 (EP,US);
B62B5/0079 (EP,US);
B66F5/00 (US);
B66F5/04 (EP,US);
B62B2202/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEBE- UND TRANSPORTVORRICHTUNG FÜR OBJEKTE MIT RÄDERN, Z. B. KRANKENHAUSBETTEN | [2014/17] | English: | LIFTING AND TRANSPORTING DEVICE FOR WHEELED OBJECTS INCLUDING HOSPITAL BEDS | [2014/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LEVAGE ET DE TRANSPORT POUR OBJETS SUR ROUES COMPRENANT DES LITS D'HÔPITAL | [2014/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 23.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.06.2012 | AL | 09.03.2016 | AT | 09.03.2016 | BE | 09.03.2016 | CY | 09.03.2016 | CZ | 09.03.2016 | DK | 09.03.2016 | EE | 09.03.2016 | ES | 09.03.2016 | FI | 09.03.2016 | HR | 09.03.2016 | LT | 09.03.2016 | LV | 09.03.2016 | MC | 09.03.2016 | MK | 09.03.2016 | NL | 09.03.2016 | RO | 09.03.2016 | RS | 09.03.2016 | SE | 09.03.2016 | SI | 09.03.2016 | SK | 09.03.2016 | SM | 09.03.2016 | TR | 09.03.2016 | BG | 09.06.2016 | NO | 09.06.2016 | GR | 10.06.2016 | IE | 18.06.2016 | LU | 18.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | IS | 09.07.2016 | PT | 11.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.06.2012 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
MK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
TR | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IE | 18.06.2016 | ||
LU | 18.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.06.2012 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
MK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
TR | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IE | 18.06.2016 | ||
LU | 18.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.06.2012 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
MK | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IE | 18.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IE | 18.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
SM | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 09.03.2016 | |
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
RS | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
HR | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011073819 (CHAN RAYMOND C [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 5A,5B *; | [A]US4986720 (HOLMES GERALD E [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 6, line 45 - column 7, line 10; figure 8 *; | [A]US5352083 (ROBERTS DON [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 9,10 * | International search | [X]WO8911983 (HELLSTROEM NILS ERIK [SE]); | [X]US2008101903 (WANER JOHN A [US], et al); | [X]EP2039336 (HOLDINGSELSKABET MKR FINANS AP [DK]); | [X]US2009134374 (KRUG NORMAN J [US]); | [XP]US8016303 (ULLMAN STUART G [US], et al) |