EP2929659 - A METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY DETECTING PHYSICAL CONNECTIONS OF ETHERNET BRIDGES CONNECTED TO A ROOT BRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POGGI, Fabio Via al Castellaccio 55/1 I-16136 Genova / IT | 02 /
GALLINO, Roberto Via Cordara 32 I-15121 Alessandria / IT | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Stasiewski, Piotr Grzegorz Ericsson Limited Patent Unit UK Unit 4 Midleton Gate Guildford Business Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 8SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12801542.7 | 10.12.2012 | [2015/42] | WO2012EP74974 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014090280 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2929659 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/721, H04L12/751 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
H04L45/66 (EP,US);
H04L49/254 (US);
H04L45/26 (US);
H04L45/44 (US);
Y02D30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN DETEKTION PHYSIKALISCHER VERBINDUNGEN VON ETHERNETBRÜCKEN MIT EINER BASISBRÜCKE | [2015/42] | English: | A METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY DETECTING PHYSICAL CONNECTIONS OF ETHERNET BRIDGES CONNECTED TO A ROOT BRIDGE | [2015/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION AUTOMATIQUE DE CONNEXIONS PHYSIQUES DE PONTS ETHERNET CONNECTÉS À UN PONT RACINE | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 25.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/21] | 10.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2001021177 (ISHII SHOJI [JP]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0065] ** paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0203] *; | [A]US7379429 (THOTTAKKARA BENNY J [US]) [A] 1-23 * column 3, line 39 - column 8, line 45 *; | [A]US2008310421 (TEISBERG ROBERT R [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0099] * |