EP2725720 - TRANSMISSION ANGLE CONTROL DEVICE, BASE STATION, TRANSMISSION ANGLE CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2014/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Kenichirou c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12802053.4 | 22.06.2012 | WO2012JP65960 | Priority number, date | JP20110139528 | 23.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011139528 | [2014/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012176867 | Date: | 27.12.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2725720 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/10, H04B7/06, H04W16/28, H04B17/00 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
H04W16/28 (EP,US);
H04J3/00 (US);
H04B17/345 (EP,US);
H04B7/024 (EP,US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/18] | H04B7/10, H04B7/06, H04W16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR ÜBERTRAGUNGSWINKELSTEUERUNG, BASISSTATION, VERFAHREN FÜR ÜBERTRAGUNGSWINKELSTEUERUNG UND PROGRAMM | [2014/18] | English: | TRANSMISSION ANGLE CONTROL DEVICE, BASE STATION, TRANSMISSION ANGLE CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2014/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'ANGLE DE TRANSMISSION, STATION DE BASE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'ANGLE DE TRANSMISSION ET PROGRAMME | [2014/18] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2014 | Translation filed | 16.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 21.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008064432 (PARK CHI-HYUN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0009] , [0011]; figure 3 *; | [Y]WO2009110730 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [Y] 1-10* paragraphs [0008] , [0083] , [0111] , [0114] , [0116]; figures 6,13-15 * | International search | [Y]JPH11215538 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11252624 (FUJITSU LTD) | by applicant | JP2005525041 |