EP2723897 - MULTIVARIATE DIAGNOSTIC ASSAYS AND METHODS FOR USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanostring Technologies, Inc 530 Fairview Ave N, Ste 2000 Seattle, WA 98109 / US | [2014/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEISS, Gary, K. 647 NW 78th Street Seattle, WA 98117 / US | 02 /
FERREE, Sean, M. 7018 3rd Avenue NW Seattle, WA 98117 / US | 03 /
WEBSTER, Philippa, Jane 4317 Densmore Avenue North Seattle, WA 98103 / US | 04 /
STORHOFF, James, Justin 6520 36th Avenue NW Seattle, WA 98117 / US | 05 /
WALLDEN, Brett 2613 143rd Place SE Mill Creek, WA 98012 / US | 06 /
PAYANDEH, Emily 1175 Park Place, Apt. 227 San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP, et al 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 12802554.1 | 22.06.2012 | WO2012US43799 | Priority number, date | US201161501170P | 24.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161501170 P | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012178046 | Date: | 27.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2723897 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.03.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6837, C12Q1/6816 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6816 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6837 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/166 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2545/113, C12Q2565/1025 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6837, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2545/101, C12Q2563/155 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2014/18] | C12Q1/68, C12N15/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Extension states | BA | 23.01.2014 | ME | 23.01.2014 | Title | German: | MULTIVARIATE DIAGNOSTISCHE TESTS UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG | [2014/18] | English: | MULTIVARIATE DIAGNOSTIC ASSAYS AND METHODS FOR USING SAME | [2014/18] | French: | DOSAGES DIAGNOSTIQUES MULTIVARIÉS ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [2014/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 11.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/30] | 19.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - MEGHANA M KULKARNI, "Digital Multiplexed Gene Expression Analysis Using the NanoString nCounter System - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology - Kulkarni - Wiley Online Library", CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (20110401), vol. 94, pages 25B10.1 - 25b10.17, XP055160282 [X] 1-15 * see whole doc. esp. p.15, bridging paragraph col.1 and col. 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/0471142727.mb25b10s94 | [I] - MALKOV VLADISLAV A ET AL, "Multiplexed measurements of gene signatures in different analytes using the Nanostring nCounter(TM) Assay System", BMC RESEARCH NOTES, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, GB, (20090509), vol. 2, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1756-0500-2-80, ISSN 1756-0500, page 80, XP021060775 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1756-0500-2-80 | International search | [A]US6815164 (KURN, N.); | [A]US2008038725 (LUO, Y. ET AL.); | [A]US6890741 (FAN, J. B., ET AL.); | [A]US2006014172 (MULLER, U. R. ET AL.); | [X] - REIS, P. P. ET AL., "mRNA transcript quantification in archival samples using multiplexed, color-coded probes", BMC BIOTECHNOL., (20110509), vol. 11, no. 46, XP021097760 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6750-11-46 | [A] - GEISS, G. K. ET AL., "Direct multiplexed measurement of gene expression with color-coded probe pairs", NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (200803), vol. 26, no. 3, pages 317 - 325, XP002505107 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT1385 | Examination | WO2010060728 | WO0020629 |