EP2728529 - CREDIT CARD INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, CREDIT CARD INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, ORDER INFORMATION RECEIVING DEVICE, CREDIT CARD SETTLEMENT DEVICE, PROGRAM, AND INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rakuten, Inc. 1-14-1, Tamagawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0094 / JP | [2015/45] |
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states Rakuten, Inc. 4-12-3, Higashishinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Yoshinori c/o Rakuten Inc. 4-12-3 Higashishinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12803667.0 | 29.05.2012 | WO2012JP63801 | Priority number, date | JP20110146203 | 30.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011146203 | [2014/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013001967 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2728529 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/24, G06Q20/02 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
G06Q20/34 (EP,US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/02 (EP,US);
G06Q20/24 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/385 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/202 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/19] | G06Q20/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Title | German: | KREDITKARTENINFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM, KREDITKARTENINFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN EMPFANG VON BESTELLINFORMATIONEN, KREDITKARTENZAHLUNGSVORRICHTUNG, PROGRAMM UND INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2014/19] | English: | CREDIT CARD INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, CREDIT CARD INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, ORDER INFORMATION RECEIVING DEVICE, CREDIT CARD SETTLEMENT DEVICE, PROGRAM, AND INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM | [2014/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS DE CARTE DE CRÉDIT, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS DE CARTE DE CRÉDIT, DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION D'INFORMATIONS D'ORDRE, DISPOSITIF DE RÈGLEMENT PAR CARTE DE CRÉDIT, PROGRAMME ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2014/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2013 | Translation filed | 30.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 07.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.10.2019 | 11.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/15] | 29.11.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US7006993 (CHEONG LESLIE [US], et al) [X] 1,8-14 * abstract * * column 2, lines 28-51 * * column 5, line 12 - column 10, line 14 * * column 17, line 41 - column 20, line 9 * * column 21, line 26 - column 23, line 4 * * column 31, line 44 - column 34, line 32 * [I] 1-14; | [I]US2011153498 (MAKHOTIN OLEG [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0044] - [0050] *; | [A]WO2009012731 (DIRECT PAY S R O [CZ], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2002298055 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2009026116 (RAKUTEN INC); | [Y]JP2010277538 (NTT DATA CORP); | [A]JP2008204248 (NOMURA RES INST LTD); | [A]JP2002366868 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2002342688 (RICOH KK) | Examination | JP2003317021 | US2003126094 | WO0195204 | US2007192245 | US6980969 | by applicant | JP2002298055 |