EP2751299 - METHOD OF ALLOYING VARIOUS GRADES OF STEEL WITH MANGANESE OXIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McMahan, Joseph Boston 1280 Muskingum River Road Marietta, OH 45750 / US | [2014/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/28] | Representative(s) | Nguyen-Van-Yen, Christian Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | Nguyen Van Yen, Christian Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 12803877.5 | 13.06.2012 | WO2012US42202 | Priority number, date | US201113169696 | 27.06.2011 Original published format: US201113169696 | [2014/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013003041 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2751299 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C22C33/00, C21C7/076, C22C38/04, C21C7/06, C21C5/28, C21C5/52, C22C33/04 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
C21C5/28 (EP,US);
C21C5/52 (EP,US);
C21C7/06 (EP,US);
C21C7/076 (EP,US);
C22C33/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/28] | C22C33/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM LEGIEREN VERSCHIEDENER STAHLKLASSEN MIT MANGANOXIDEN | [2014/28] | English: | METHOD OF ALLOYING VARIOUS GRADES OF STEEL WITH MANGANESE OXIDES | [2014/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ALLIAGE DE DIVERSES QUALITÉS D'ACIER À DES OXYDES DE MANGANÈSE | [2014/28] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2014 | Search fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/28] | 31.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 18.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/10] | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 15.05.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.2014 | Decision despatched | 15.05.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 15.05.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]KR100860656B (HYUNDAI STEEL CO [KR]) [X] 1 * abstract * * See "Invention Configuration" Automatic translation by KIPO. * [A] 8-12 [I] 2-7; | [XI]WO2010077040 (POSCO [KR], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-7; | [XI]CN101092656 (YONGTONG SPECIAL STEELS CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1 * abstract * * See Automatic Translation provided by SIPO * [I] 2-7 | International search | [X]US2830891 (UDY MARVIN J); | [Y]US4613363 (WIENERT FRITZ O [US]); | [A]US2011094336 (SPITZER KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al); | [A]US2011000339 (ROSE LUTZ [DE], et al); | [A]US4662937 (KATAYAMA HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US4576638 (DOERR HERMANN [DE], et al); | [A]US4537629 (LAZCANO-NAVARRO ARTURO [MX], et al); | [A]US2746857 (WRIGHT EDWIN C) |