EP2727804 - STRADDLE VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/19] | SADDLE-TYPE VEHICLE | ||
[2019/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2014/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAI, Hideaki c/o KAWASAKI JOKOGYOKABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Kawasaki-cho, Akashi-shi Hyogo 673-8666 / JP | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2014/19] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12803926.0 | 28.05.2012 | [2020/18] | WO2012JP03462 | Priority number, date | JP20110145238 | 30.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011145238 | [2014/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013001712 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2727804 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2727804 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B62K11/04 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
B62K11/04 (EP,US);
B60K15/063 (US);
B60K13/02 (US);
B62J11/19 (EP);
B62J45/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/19] | B62J9/00, B62J35/00, B62J99/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRÄTSCHSITZ-FAHRZEUG | [2019/52] | English: | STRADDLE VEHICLE | [2019/52] | French: | VÉHICULE DU TYPE MONTÉ À CALIFOURCHON | [2019/52] |
Former [2014/19] | SATTELFAHRZEUG | ||
Former [2014/19] | SADDLE-TYPE VEHICLE | ||
Former [2014/19] | VÉHICULE DU TYPE À SELLE | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2014 | Translation filed | 29.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 15.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.05.2012 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | ES | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | IT | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | MT | 29.04.2020 | NL | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | TR | 29.04.2020 | IE | 28.05.2020 | LU | 28.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.05.2012 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 28.05.2020 | ||
LU | 28.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 28.05.2020 | ||
LU | 28.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 28.05.2020 | ||
LU | 28.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 28.05.2020 | ||
LU | 28.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
LU | 28.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JP2003341573 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1,2,4,5,7 * paragraphs [0012] - [0086]; figures 1-23 * [A] 3,6; | [YA]EP1566540 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,7 * paragraphs [0039] - [0161]; figures 1-15 *[A] 3,6 | International search | [A]JPS55139991U (HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.); | [A]JPS6175078 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0516857 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD); | [X]JP2000313388 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2001114158 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD); | [X]JP2007145132 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2008213541 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2010234906 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2011031717 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH07309275 | JP2006123656 |