EP2725793 - IMAGE DECODING METHOD, IMAGE ENCODING METHOD, IMAGE DECODING DEVICE, IMAGE ENCODING DEVICE, AND IMAGE ENCODING/DECODING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor New York NY 10017 / US | ||
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue Suite 200 Torrance CA 90503 / US | ||
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAI, Hisao c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NISHI, Takahiro c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
SHIBAHARA, Youji c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
SUGIO, Toshiyasu c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
TANIKAWA, Kyoko c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
MATSUNOBU, Toru c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku OSaka 540-6207 / JP | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12803936.9 | 22.06.2012 | WO2012JP04060 | Priority number, date | US201161501390P | 27.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161501390 P | [2014/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013001764 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2725793 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/134, H04N19/593, H04N19/176, H04N19/139, H04N19/13, H04N19/463, H04N19/70, H04N19/51, H04N19/12 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
H04N19/52 (EP,US);
H04N19/91 (KR);
H04N19/13 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/105 (US);
H04N19/109 (CN);
H04N19/119 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/122 (US);
H04N19/134 (EP,US);
H04N19/139 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/196 (US);
H04N19/30 (CN);
H04N19/46 (US);
H04N19/463 (EP,US);
H04N19/583 (US);
H04N19/593 (EP,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,US);
H04N19/96 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2014/18] | H04N7/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Title | German: | BILDDEKODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, BILDKODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, BILDDEKODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDKODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BILDKODIERUNGS-/DEKODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/18] | English: | IMAGE DECODING METHOD, IMAGE ENCODING METHOD, IMAGE DECODING DEVICE, IMAGE ENCODING DEVICE, AND IMAGE ENCODING/DECODING DEVICE | [2014/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE D'IMAGE, DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE, DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE D'IMAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE/DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE | [2014/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2013 | Translation filed | 27.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 04.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/08] | 04.10.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/08] | Appeal following examination | 23.01.2019 | Appeal received No. T1069/19 | 27.03.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.10.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 09.11.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 04.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP23196482.6 / EP4270950 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005018768 (MABEY DANNY L [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * figure 2 *; | [XY] - THOMAS WIEGAND ET AL, "WD3: Working Draft 3 of High-Efficiency Video Coding - _D7", JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING (JCT-VC) OF ITU-T SG16 WP3 AND ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 5TH MEETING, (20110615), vol. JCTVC-E607_d7, XP055146641 [X] 1-3,5,6 * sections 7.4.5-7.4.8 and 9.3.3.1.1 * [Y] 4 | [A] - LOU J ET AL, "On context selection for significant_coeff_flag coding", 5. JCT-VC MEETING; 96. MPEG MEETING; 16-3-2011 - 23-3-2011; GENEVA;(JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110313), no. JCTVC-E362, ISSN 0000-0005, XP030008868 [A] 1-6 * section 2 * * abstract * | [A] - SZE V ET AL, "CE11: Simplified context selection for significant_coeff_flag (JCTVC-C227)", 4. JCT-VC MEETING; 95. MPEG MEETING; 20-1-2011 - 28-1-2011; DAEGU;(JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110115), no. JCTVC-D195, ISSN 0000-0013, XP030008235 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - GARY J SULLIVAN ET AL, "Meeting report of the fifth meeting of the Joint Collaborative Team on Video Coding (JCT-VC), Geneva, CH, 16-23 March 2011", 5. JCT-VC MEETING; 96. MPEG MEETING; 16-3-2011 - 23-3-2011; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110321), no. JCTVC-E600, XP030009012 [A] 1-6 * section 18.-13 - JCTVC-E324 *; page 136 * | [YD] - THOMAS WIEGAND ET AL, "WD2: Working Draft 2 of High-Efficiency Video Coding", 4. JCT-VC MEETING; 95. MPEG MEETING; 20-1-2011 - 28-1-2011; DAEGU; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110415), no. JCTVC-D503, XP030113315 [YD] 1-6 * sections 7.3.5-7.3.8, 7.4.5-7.4.8, 9.3.3.1 * | [Y] - JVT, "Text of Joint FCD for Joint Video Specification", 4. JVT MEETING; 61. MPEG MEETING; 22-07-2002 - 26-07-2002; KLAGENFURT,AT; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20020726), no. JVT-D157, ISSN 0000-0439, XP030005420 [Y] 1-6 * sections 8.5.2 and 9.2.2 * | [A] - SZE (MIT) V ET AL, "Joint Algorithm-Architecture Optimization of CABAC", 96. MPEG MEETING; 21-3-2011 - 25-3-2011; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20110317), no. m19852, XP030048419 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [XPI] - SASAI H ET AL, "Modified Context Derivation for neighboring dependency reduction", 6. JCT-VC MEETING; 97. MPEG MEETING; 14-7-2011 - 22-7-2011; TORINO; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110701), no. JCTVC-F429, XP030009452 [XP] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document * [I] 4 | [IP] - SASAI H ET AL, "Modified MVD coding for CABAC", 97. MPEG MEETING; 18-7-2011 - 22-7-2011; TORINO; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20120607), no. m20851, XP030049414 [IP] 1-6 * section 2 * | [IP] - SZE (TI) V ET AL, "Simplified MVD context selection (Extension of JCTVC-E324)", 6. JCT-VC MEETING; 97. MPEG MEETING; 14-7-2011 - 22-7-2011; TORINO; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110630), no. JCTVC-F133, XP030009156 [IP] 1-6 * section 1 * | [IP] - SZE (BOG COORDINATOR) V, "BoG report on context reduction for CABAC", 6. JCT-VC MEETING; 97. MPEG MEETING; 14-7-2011 - 22-7-2011; TORINO; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110721), no. JCTVC-F746, XP030009769 [IP] 1-6 * section 2 * | International search | [X] - THOMAS WIEGAND, "Joint Final Committee Draft (JFCD) of Joint Video Specification (ITU-T Rec. H.264 I ISO/IEC 14496-10 AVC)", JOINT VIDEO TEAM (JVT) OF ISO/IEC MPEG AND ITU-T VCEG 4TH MEETING, KLAGENFURT, AUSTRIA, (20020722), XP002436201 | [A] - VIVIENNE SZE ET AL., "Joint Algorithm-Architecture Optimization of CABAC", JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING (JCT-VC) OF ITU-T SG16 WP3 AND ISO/IEC JTC1/ SC29/WG11 5TH MEETING, GENEVA, CH, (20110316), XP030048419 | by applicant | - DETLEV MARPE, "Context-Based Adaptive Binary Arithmetic Coding in the H.264/AVC Video Compression Standard", IEEE TRANSACTION ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, (200307), vol. 13, no. 7 | - "Joint Collaborative Team on Video Coding (JCT-VC) of ITU-T SG16 WP3 and ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11", WD2: WORKING DRAFT 2 OF HIGH-EFFICIENCY VIDEO CODING, (20110120), URL: http://wftp3. itu. int/av-arch/jctvc-site/2011_01_D_Daegu/JCTVC-D5 03.doc |