EP2725980 - TARGET IDENTIFICATION TOOL FOR INTRA-LUMENAL LOCALIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2014/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORILLO, Thomas 313 Lythrum Lane Medina, MN 55340 / US | 02 /
GRUDEM, Jerome, Kent, Jr. 14039 Vicki Circle Rogers, MN 55374 / US | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12804313.0 | 28.06.2012 | WO2012US44714 | Priority number, date | US201161501931P | 28.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161501931 P | [2014/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013003632 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2725980 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, A61B19/00 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00893 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3904 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3912 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3945 (EP,US);
A61B2090/395 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/19] | A61B6/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Title | German: | ZIELIDENTIFIKATIONSINSTRUMENT FÜR INTRALUMINALE LOKALISIERUNG | [2014/19] | English: | TARGET IDENTIFICATION TOOL FOR INTRA-LUMENAL LOCALIZATION | [2014/19] | French: | OUTIL D'IDENTIFICATION DE CIBLE POUR LOCALISATION INTRALUMINALE | [2014/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 29.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/30] | 21.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6371904 (SIRIMANNE D LAKSEN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure - *; | [X]WO2005000161 (OVION INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 7 *; | [A]US2005165305 (FOERSTER SETH A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure - *; | [X]WO2007035798 (CALYPSO MED TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0060]; figure - *; | [A]US2009221913 (VOEGELE JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure - * | International search | [Y]US6162245 (JAYARAMAN SWAMINATHAN [IN]); | [X]US6371904 (SIRIMANNE D LAKSEN [US], et al); | [A]US2003225420 (WARDLE JOHN L [US]); | [X]US2004098111 (EDER JOSEPH C [US], et al); | [A]US2005165305 (FOERSTER SETH A [US], et al); | [Y]US2007162110 (DAVE VIPUL BHUPENDRA [US]); | [X]US2009093875 (STALKER KENT C B [US], et al); | [X]US2009221913 (VOEGELE JAMES W [US], et al); | [X]US2010305686 (CRAGG ANDREW H [US], et al) |