EP2728253 - STEAM GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2014/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UMEHARA, Ryuichi c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
MONDE, Masatsugu c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
KAWAKAMI, Ryoichi c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 04 /
NAKAGAWA, Tomoya c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 05 /
HIROTA, Kazuo c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 06 /
IWAMOTO, Yoichi c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 07 /
MUROYA, Itaru c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12804360.1 | 21.06.2012 | WO2012JP65862 | Priority number, date | JP20110143554 | 28.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011143554 | JP20110253188 | 18.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011253188 | JP20110271083 | 12.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011271083 | [2014/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013002118 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2728253 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F22B37/20, F22B1/16, F28D7/16, F28F9/00, G21D1/00 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
F22B37/206 (EP,US);
F22B1/025 (EP,US);
F28D1/0475 (US);
F28D7/1638 (EP,US);
F28F9/013 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0054 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0064 (EP,US);
F28F2225/04 (EP,US);
F28F2265/00 (EP,US);
F28F2265/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Title | German: | DAMPFERZEUGER | [2014/19] | English: | STEAM GENERATOR | [2014/19] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR DE VAPEUR | [2014/19] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2013 | Translation filed | 26.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 17.06.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5515911 (BOULA GERARD [FR], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 3, line 66 - column 6, line 13 *; | [A]US5692557 (GILLET NICOLAS [FR], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 4, line 27 - column 7, line 18 *; | [XA]US5042433 (MONNIER BERNARD [FR]) [X] 18 * abstract * * column 2, lines 21-45 * * column 3, line 16 - column 5, line 36 * [A] 19-24; | [XA]US2009020273 (SCHNEIDER WILLIAM G [CA], et al) [X] 18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0010] - [0 38] - [0044] - [0 48] - [0052] * [A] 19-24 | International search | [A]JP2009024994 (BABCOCK & WILCOX CANADA LTD); | [A]JP2006105589 (FRAMATOME SA); | [A]JPS56117292U (HITACHI ZOSEN CORP.) | by applicant | US6772832 |