EP2727743 - PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SETO, Hideki c/o The Yokohama Rubber Co. Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1 Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | 02 /
ENDO, Toyoaki c/o The Yokohama Rubber Co. Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1 Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | 03 /
HASHIMURA, Yoshiaki c/o The Yokohama Rubber Co. Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1 Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstrasse 58 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12804431.0 | 15.05.2012 | [2017/10] | WO2012JP62422 | Priority number, date | JP20110143909 | 29.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011143909 | [2014/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013001927 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2727743 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2727743 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60C5/14, B60C13/00, B29D30/30, B60C1/00, B29D30/06 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
B60C5/142 (EP);
B29D30/3007 (EP);
B60C1/0008 (EP);
B60C9/14 (EP);
B29D2030/0682 (EP);
B60C2005/145 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2015/11] | B60C5/14, B60C13/00, B29D30/30, B60C1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2014/19] | B60C5/14, B60C13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTREIFEN | [2014/19] | English: | PNEUMATIC TIRE | [2014/19] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE | [2014/19] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2014 | Translation filed | 21.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 26.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2012 | AL | 08.03.2017 | AT | 08.03.2017 | CY | 08.03.2017 | CZ | 08.03.2017 | DK | 08.03.2017 | EE | 08.03.2017 | ES | 08.03.2017 | FI | 08.03.2017 | HR | 08.03.2017 | IT | 08.03.2017 | LT | 08.03.2017 | LV | 08.03.2017 | MC | 08.03.2017 | MK | 08.03.2017 | NL | 08.03.2017 | PL | 08.03.2017 | RO | 08.03.2017 | RS | 08.03.2017 | SE | 08.03.2017 | SI | 08.03.2017 | SK | 08.03.2017 | SM | 08.03.2017 | TR | 08.03.2017 | IE | 15.05.2017 | LU | 15.05.2017 | MT | 15.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | FR | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | BG | 08.06.2017 | GB | 08.06.2017 | NO | 08.06.2017 | GR | 09.06.2017 | IS | 08.07.2017 | PT | 10.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 15.05.2012 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MK | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
TR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
MT | 15.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 15.05.2012 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MK | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
MT | 15.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.05.2012 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
MT | 15.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.05.2012 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
MT | 15.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
MT | 15.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | ES | 08.03.2017 | |
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2657044 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-4,6,7 * figures 1(c),6; examples 1-6; claims 1-4 *; | [AD]JP2009241855 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [AD] 1-7 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2008126437 (THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD.); | [Y]JP2011057184 (BRIDGESTONE CORP.); | [Y]JP2009248965 (BRIDGESTONE CORP.); | [Y]JPH04355121 (BRIDGESTONE CORP.); | [Y]JP2008012945 (BRIDGESTONE CORP.); | [Y]JP2004322782 (THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD.); | [Y]JP2001294024 (BRIDGESTONE CORP.) |