EP2726747 - HYDRAULIC CONTROL SYSTEM HAVING SWING MOTOR ENERGY RECOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caterpillar Inc. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, IL 61629-9510 / US | [2014/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Jiao 1651 Pathway Drive Naperville, IL 60565 / US | 02 /
SHANG, Tonglin 1483 Raven Drive Bolingbrook, IL 60490 / US | 03 /
SPRING, Peter 139 Circle Drive W. Montgomery, IL 60538 / US | 04 /
MA, Pengfei 1744 Cornell Court Naperville, IL 60565 / US | 05 /
PETERSON, Randal 7006 N. Draycott Place Peoria, IL 61615 / US | 06 /
CESUR, Rustu 168 W. 20th Street Lombard, IL 60148 / US | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12805321.2 | 14.06.2012 | WO2012US42349 | Priority number, date | US201113171047 | 28.06.2011 Original published format: US201113171047 | [2014/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013003046 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2726747 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F15B21/14, F15B17/02, E02F9/22, F15B15/18, F15B13/02, E02F9/12, F15B1/02 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
F15B21/14 (EP,US);
E02F9/123 (EP,US);
E02F9/2217 (EP,US);
E02F9/2296 (EP,US);
F15B1/02 (EP,US);
F15B11/024 (US);
F15B1/033 (US);
F15B2011/0243 (US);
F15B2011/0246 (US);
F15B2211/205 (US);
F15B2211/212 (EP,US);
F15B2211/30575 (EP,US);
F15B2211/50527 (EP,US);
F15B2211/50554 (US);
F15B2211/511 (US);
F15B2211/613 (EP,US);
F15B2211/625 (US);
F15B2211/7058 (EP,US);
F15B2211/88 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/19] | F15B21/14, F15B17/02, E02F9/22, F15B15/18, F15B13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHES STEUERSYSTEM MIT VIBRATIONSMOTOR-ENERGIERÜCKGEWINNUNG | [2014/19] | English: | HYDRAULIC CONTROL SYSTEM HAVING SWING MOTOR ENERGY RECOVERY | [2014/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE À RÉCUPÉRATION DE L'ÉNERGIE DU MOTEUR DE BASCULEMENT | [2014/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 09.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/23] | 29.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2009228394 (MINTAH BRIAN [US] ET AL) [Y] 1,2,10 * the whole document * [A] 3-9; | [YA]US7908852 (ZHANG JIAO [US] ET AL) [Y] 1,2,10 * abstract * [A] 3-9; | [A]JP2010106487 (CATERPILLAR JAPAN LTD) [A] 1,10 * abstract *; | [A]WO2009024197 (LIEBHERR FRANCE SAS [FR]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US2009228394 (MINTAH BRIAN [US], et al); | [Y]US7908852 (ZHANG JIAO [US], et al); | [A]JP2010106487 (CATERPILLAR JAPAN LTD); | [A]KR20100053665 (LIEBHERR FRANCE SAS [FR]) | by applicant | US7908852 | US2009223394 |