EP2782685 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING AND SORTING OF RECYCLABLE WOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/40] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING AND SEPARATING WOOD FOR RECYCLING | ||
[2016/48] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Societe d'Economie Mixte d'Actions pour la Revalorisation des Dechets et des Energies Locales Ecosite de Vert-le-Grand 91810 Vert-le-Grand / FR | [2014/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAPEZ, Arnault 1 Allée des Neiges F-77150 Ferolles-Atilly / FR | 02 /
CHRETIEN, Denis c/o SEMARDEL Ecosite de Vert-le-Grand F-91810 Vert-le-Grand / FR | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Petit, Maxime, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Petit, Maxime, et al BREMA-LOYER Le Centralis 63 Avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-La-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 12806555.4 | 22.11.2012 | WO2012FR52705 | Priority number, date | FR20110060649 | 22.11.2011 Original published format: FR 1160649 | [2014/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013076428 | Date: | 30.05.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2782685 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B07C5/14 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
B07C5/14 (EP);
G01N21/718 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN UND SORTIEREN VON HOLZABFÄLLEN | [2016/48] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING AND SORTING OF RECYCLABLE WOOD | [2016/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'IDENTIFICATION ET DE TRI DE MATIERE BOIS DE RECYCLAGE | [2014/40] |
Former [2014/40] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND TRENNUNG VON HOLZ ZUR WIEDERAUFBEREITUNG | ||
Former [2014/40] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING AND SEPARATING WOOD FOR RECYCLING | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 12.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/41] | 15.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2015 | 30.11.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003034281 (KUMAR PRADEEP [US]) [X] 19,24-39 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2008110017 | EP1533045 | WO2009075580 | EP1483062 | US2010185319 |