EP2726978 - DYNAMIC PINNING OF VIRTUAL PAGES SHARED BETWEEN DIFFERENT TYPE PROCESSORS OF A HETEROGENEOUS COMPUTING PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEAFFER, Gad 80 Grinboim 34987 Haifa / IL | 02 /
GINZBURG, Boris Beilis 6/3 34814 Haifa / IL | 03 /
RONEN, Ronny 156 Aba Hushi Av. 34988 Haifa / IL | 04 /
WEISSMANN, Eliezer Albert Switcher 10 34995 Haifa / IL | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 12807063.8 | 29.06.2012 | WO2012US45055 | Priority number, date | US201113175489 | 01.07.2011 Original published format: US201113175489 | [2014/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013006476 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2726978 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/126, G06F12/1027, G06F13/16, G06F12/0804, G06F9/06, G06F12/08, G06F12/10, G06F12/12 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
G06F12/1027 (EP,US);
G06F12/126 (EP,US);
G06F13/1663 (EP,US);
G06F12/0804 (EP,US);
G06F2212/303 (EP,US);
G06F2212/657 (US);
G06F2212/684 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/51] | G06F9/06, G06F12/08, G06F12/10, G06F12/12 | ||
Former IPC [2014/19] | G06F9/06, G06F12/08, G06F12/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE HEFTEN VIRTUELLER, ZWISCHEN VERSCHIEDENEN PROZESSORTYPEN EINER HETEROGENEN COMPUTERPLATTFORM GETEILTEN SEITEN | [2014/19] | English: | DYNAMIC PINNING OF VIRTUAL PAGES SHARED BETWEEN DIFFERENT TYPE PROCESSORS OF A HETEROGENEOUS COMPUTING PLATFORM | [2014/19] | French: | ÉPINGLAGE DYNAMIQUE DE PAGES VIRTUELLES PARTAGÉES ENTRE DES PROCESSEURS DE TYPES DIFFÉRENTS D'UNE PLATE-FORME INFORMATIQUE HÉTÉROGÈNE | [2014/19] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 05.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/13] | 08.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6662289 (ANG BOON SEONG [US]) [X] 1,6,11 * abstract * * column 9, line 63 - column 10, line 53 * * figure 3 * [A] 2-5,7-10,12-15; | [YA]US2011161619 (KAMINSKI PATRYK [US], et al) [Y] 5,10,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0114] * * figure 4d * [A] 1,3,6,8,11,13 | [XY] - AZIMI R ET AL, "MINI: REDUCING NETWORK INTERFACE MEMORY REQUIREMENTS WITH DYNAMIC HANDLE LOOKUP", 2003 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SUPERCOMPUTING. (ICS). SAN FRANCISCO, CA, JUNE 23 - 26, 2003; [ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SUPERCOMPUTING], NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (20030623), vol. CONF. 17, doi:10.1145/782814.782851, ISBN 978-1-58113-733-0, pages 261 - 272, XP001198479 [X] 1-4,6-9,11-14 * abstract * * page 263, column left, line 58 - page 266, column left, line 27 * * page 268, column left, line 20 - line 21 * [Y] 5,10,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/782814.782851 | [XA] - WELSH M ET AL, "MEMORY MANAGEMENT FOR USER-LEVEL NETWORK INTERFACES", IEEE MICRO, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (19980301), vol. 18, no. 2, doi:10.1109/40.671405, ISSN 0272-1732, pages 77 - 82, XP000751589 [X] 1,6,11 * page 77, column right, line 25 - page 79, column right, line 21 * [A] 2-5,7-10,12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/40.671405 | [A] - TEZUKA H ET AL, "Pin-down cache: a virtual memory management technique for zero-copy communication", PARALLEL PROCESSING SYMPOSIUM, 1998. IPPS/SPDP 1998. PROCEEDINGS OF TH E FIRST MERGED INTERNATIONAL ... AND SYMPOSIUM ON PARALLEL AND DISTRIB UTED PROCESSING 1998 ORLANDO, FL, USA 30 MARCH-3 APRIL 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19980330), doi:10.1109/IPPS.1998.669932, ISBN 978-0-8186-8404-3, pages 308 - 314, XP010276766 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 308, column right, line 35 - line 38 * * page 311, column left, line 35 - column right, line 20 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IPPS.1998.669932 | International search | [A]US2011161619 (KAMINSKI PATRYK [US], et al); | [A]US2008028181 (TONG PETER C [US], et al); | [A]US2009254774 (CHAMDANI JOSEPH I [US], et al); | [A]US2007299990 (BEN-YEHUDA SHMUEL [IL], et al) | by applicant | US6662289 | US2011161619 | - ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SUPERCOMPUTING, ACM, (20030623), pages 261 - 272 | - "MEMORY MANAGEMENT FOR USERLEVEL NETWORK INTERFACES", WELSH M, IEEE MICRO, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, (19980301), vol. 18, pages 77 - 82 | - "Pin-down cache: a virtual memory management technique for zero-copy communication", TEZUKA H et al., PARALLEL PROCESSING SYMPOSIUM, 1998. IPPS/SPDP 1998. PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIRST MERGED INTERNATIONAL ... AND SYMPOSIUM ON PARALLEL AND DISTRIB UTED PROCESSING 1998, IEEE COMPUT. SOC, (19980330), pages 308 - 314 |