EP2713421 - CELL WIRING MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autonetworks Technologies, Ltd. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2014/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINOSHITA Yuko c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | 02 /
HIRAMITSU Hiroomi c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | 03 /
HIRAI Hiroki c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | 04 /
TAKASE Shinichi c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | 05 /
OKAMOTO Ryoya c/o AUTONETWORKSTECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | 06 /
NAKAYAMA Osamu c/o AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-8503 / JP | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Elsenheimerstraße 65 DE-80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12807244.4 | 15.06.2012 | WO2012JP65339 | Priority number, date | JP20110149074 | 05.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011149074 | [2014/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013005558 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2713421 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/20, H01M2/10, B60L11/18, H01R11/28 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
H01M50/209 (EP,CN,US);
H01R11/281 (US);
H01M50/503 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/507 (EP,CN,US);
H01R11/288 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/14] | H01M2/20, H01M2/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/14] | Title | German: | ZELLENVERKABELUNGSMODUL | [2014/14] | English: | CELL WIRING MODULE | [2014/14] | French: | MODULE DE CÂBLAGE D'ÉLÉMENTS | [2014/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2013 | Translation filed | 27.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/14] | 08.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/34] | 03.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010056750 (JOHNSON CONTROLS SAFT ADVANCED [US], et al) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [X]JP2011124176 (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD, et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0055] * | International search | [A]JP2010225449 (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD, et al); | [A]JP2011067012 (YAZAKI CORP); | [A]JP2011077031 (YAZAKI CORP); | [A]JP2011091003 (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD, et al); | [X]JP2011124176 (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD, et al) |