EP2761516 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOW JITTER DISTRIBUTED CLOCK CALIBRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sheafor, Stephen, James 1133 Timber Lane Boulder, CO 80304 / US | [2014/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/32] | Representative(s) | Hirsz, Christopher Stanislaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Hirsz, Christopher Stanislaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12807437.4 | 29.06.2012 | WO2012US45074 | Priority number, date | US201161504223P | 03.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161504223 P | US201213401268 | 21.02.2012 Original published format: US201213401268 | [2014/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013006481 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2761516 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/10, G05F1/46, G05F3/08, G06F1/10, H03K21/02, H03K23/50, G06F1/08, H03K21/00, H03K3/012 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
G05F1/462 (EP,US);
G05F3/08 (EP,US);
G05F3/262 (EP,US);
G06F1/08 (EP,US);
G06F1/10 (EP,US);
H03K21/023 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/32] | G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR VERTEILTE TAKTKALIBRIERUNG MIT NIEDRIGEN SCHWANKUNGEN | [2014/32] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOW JITTER DISTRIBUTED CLOCK CALIBRATION | [2014/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR UN ÉTALONNAGE D'HORLOGE DISTRIBUÉ À FAIBLE GIGUE | [2014/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2014 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 30.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 15.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/52] | 02.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees FI, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 30.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.07.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 30.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.07.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 30.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.07.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 30.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.07.2014 | Decision despatched | 30.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.07.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2008082279 (ASHBURN MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-7 * [A] 6,8-15 [Y] 4,5,7; | [Y]US7764131 (SETH MANU [US], et al) [Y] 4,5,7 * column 5, line 24 - column 14, line 12; figures 3-7 * | International search | [X]WO0188635 (ERICSSON INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2008082279 (ASHBURN MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [Y]US6417707 (UNDERHILL MICHAEL JAMES [GB], et al); | [Y]EP0516171 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [Y]US3601591 (GAINES BRIAN RONALD, et al); | [Y]US4179670 (KINGSBURY NICHOLAS G [GB]); | [Y]US6853698 (NGUYEN ANDY T [US]); | [Y]US5983014 (SHAY MICHAEL J [US]); | [Y]US5262716 (GREGORY JR WALTER L [US], et al); | [Y]US2008016384 (SMITH JEREMY D [US], et al) |