EP2730286 - COMPOSITION FOR MAINTAINING BONE HEALTH AND FOR TREATING OSTEOARTHRITIS AND OSTEOARTHROSIS OF THE JOINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OBSCHESTVO S ORGANICHENNOI OTVESTVENNOSTJU "PARAFARM" Ul. Sverdlova 4 Penza 440026 / RU | [2018/25] |
Former [2014/20] | For all designated states OBSCHESTVO S ORGANICHENNOI OTVESTVENNOSTJU "PARAFARM" Ul. Sverdlova 4 Penza 440026 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRIFONOV, Vyacheslav Nikolaevich ul. 30-letya Pobedy 45-89 Zarechnij 442960 Penzenskaja obl. / RU | 02 /
ELISTRATOVA, Julia Anatoljevna ul. Volodarskogo 9-68 Penza 440026 / RU | 03 /
ELISTRATOV, Konstantin Gennadievich ul. Tolstogo 5-45 Penza 440061 / RU | 04 /
KURUS, Natalia Vyacheslavovna ul. Volodarskogo 9-66 Penza 440061 / RU | 05 /
HOMYKOVA, Irina Vladimirovna ul. Ternovskogo 203-185 Penza 440003 / RU | 06 /
ELISTRATOVA, Tatiana Viktorovna ul. Suvorova 192a-49 Penza 440018 / RU | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Engel, Christoph Klaus, et al PATENTSCHUTZengel Marktplatz 6 98527 Suhl / DE | [2018/25] |
Former [2014/20] | Buchanan, Luke Noel Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 12807575.1 | 03.07.2012 | [2018/25] | WO2012RU00528 | Priority number, date | RU20110127494 | 05.07.2011 Original published format: RU 2011127494 | [2014/20] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013006094 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | RU | [2013/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2730286 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2730286 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 30.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A23L21/20, A23L33/105, A23L33/10 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
A61K36/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/288 (US);
A23K10/30 (EP,US);
A23K20/10 (EP,US);
A23K50/40 (EP,US);
A23L21/20 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A61K31/202 (EP,US);
A61K31/353 (EP,US);
A61K35/63 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/202, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/00, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/306 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/25] | A61K36/185, A61K35/64, A61K31/352, A23L1/00, A61P19/10, A61P19/04, A61P19/02, A23L1/076, A23L1/30 | ||
Former IPC [2014/20] | A61K36/185, A61K35/64, A61K31/352, A23L1/00, A61P19/10, A61P19/04, A61P19/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ERHALTUNG DER KNOCHENGESUNDHEIT UND ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON OSTEOARTHRITIS UND OSTEOARTHROSE DER GELENKE | [2014/20] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR MAINTAINING BONE HEALTH AND FOR TREATING OSTEOARTHRITIS AND OSTEOARTHROSIS OF THE JOINTS | [2014/20] | French: | COMPOSITION DESTINÉE À MAINTENIR LES OS EN BONNE SANTÉ ET À TRAITER L'OSTÉOARTHRITE OU L'OSTÉOARTHROSE DES ARTICULATIONS | [2014/20] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2014 | Translation filed | 27.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 14.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 20.06.2018 | CY | 20.06.2018 | HR | 20.06.2018 | LT | 20.06.2018 | MC | 20.06.2018 | MK | 20.06.2018 | SI | 20.06.2018 | SK | 20.06.2018 | SM | 20.06.2018 | LU | 03.07.2018 | MT | 03.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | NO | 20.09.2018 | IS | 20.10.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/08] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
LU | 03.07.2018 | ||
MT | 03.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
LU | 03.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | HR | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
LU | 03.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | HR | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
LU | 03.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | HR | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
LU | 03.07.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | HR | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | HR | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | HR | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | HR | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | HR | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | LT | 20.06.2018 | |
NO | 20.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | RU2004121173 [ ]; | [A]EP2135517 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]RU2412616 (OOO PARAFARM [RU]) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | EP2508083 [ ] (OBSHESTVO S OGRANICHENNOJ OTVETSTVENNOSTJU PARAFARM [RU]) | International search | [A]WO0101996 (UNIV WESTERN AUSTRALIA [AU], et al); | [X]RU2314717 (SOSIETE DE PRODJUI NESTLE S. A.); | [X]RU2412616 (OOO PARAFARM [RU]); | [X] - "Biologicheski aktivnaya dobavka ''Epam-31 ''.", FEDERALNY REESTR BIOLOGICHESKI AKTIVNYKH DOBAVOK K PISCHE. MOSCOW, IZDATELSTVO «KOGELET», (2000), page 300, XP008172983 | by applicant | RU2239438 | EA006528 | RU2349339 | RU2353349 | - R. NORDEMAR, BACK PAIN., (1988), page 144 | - V.P. KESSEL., WHEN JOINTS ACHE, (1979), page 96 | - BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE FOOD SUPPLEMENTS., (2002), page 47 | - Biologically Active Food Supplements, NAUKA, (2002), page 49 |