EP2729073 - NEEDLE LENGTH DETERMINATION AND CALIBRATION FOR INSERTION GUIDANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R. BARD, INC. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILKES, Bryson, G. 1003 North Fox Hollow Drive North Salt Lake, UT 84054 / US | 02 /
NEWMAN, Jon, B. 1337 Deerfield Drive Centerville, UT 84014 / US | 03 /
MESSERLY, Shayne 172 East 650 South Kaysville, UT 84037 / US | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12807886.2 | 06.07.2012 | WO2012US45814 | Priority number, date | US201161505036P | 06.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161505036 P | [2014/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013006817 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2729073 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/12 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
A61B5/062 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61B5/283 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61B5/6846 (KR);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B8/08 (KR);
A61B8/0841 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61B8/12 (KR);
A61B90/11 (EP,US);
A61B90/98 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2072 (US);
A61B2090/061 (EP,US);
A61B2090/378 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3788 (US);
A61B2090/3954 (EP,US);
A61B2562/02 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Title | German: | NADELLÄNGENBESTIMMUNG UND -KALIBRIERUNG FÜR EIN EINSATZFÜHRUNGSSYSTEM | [2014/20] | English: | NEEDLE LENGTH DETERMINATION AND CALIBRATION FOR INSERTION GUIDANCE SYSTEM | [2014/20] | French: | DÉTERMINATION ET ÉTALONNAGE DE LONGUEUR D'AIGUILLE POUR UN SYSTÈME DE GUIDAGE D'INTRODUCTION | [2014/20] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 08.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/11] | 26.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007073155 (PARK ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 12-15 * paragraphs [0049] - [0066]; figures 1-5B *; | [Y]US6626832 (PALTIELI YOAV [IL], et al) [Y] 12-15 * column 8, lines 9-24; figure 4A *; | [A]US2006106306 (ESSNER RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 12-15 * paragraphs [0039] - [0051]; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US2007049822 (BUNCE STEVEN M [US], et al) [A] 12-15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0031]; figures 2A-D *; | [A]US2003163142 (PALTIELI YOAV [IL], et al) [A] 12-15 * paragraphs [0144] - [0162]; figures 10-11C *; | [A]US2011015533 (COX JEREMY B [US], et al) [A] 12-15 * paragraphs [0108] - [0122]; figures 1-33 * | International search | [A]US2009124906 (CALUSER CALIN [US]); | [A]US2010130854 (SHACHAR YEHOSHUA [US], et al); | [A]US7966063 (OSHIMA YOSHITAKE [JP], et al) |