EP2798009 - THERMOPLASTIC POWDER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [2018/15] |
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states E. I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOU, Richard, T. 173 Thompson Drive Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | 02 /
KELLY, Mark, B. 5865 Bicentennial Lane Beaumont, Texas 77706 / US | 03 /
MAGNIN, Olivier CH. de la Marchaude 8 CH-1052 Le Mont-Sur-Lausanne / CH | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Dannenberger, Oliver Andre Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastrasse 17 81925 München / DE | [2018/15] |
Former [2014/45] | Dannenberger, Oliver Andre Abitz & Partner Arabellastrasse 17 81925 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 12808664.2 | 27.12.2012 | [2018/15] | WO2012US71736 | Priority number, date | US201113341684 | 30.12.2011 Original published format: US201113341684 | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013101886 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2798009 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2798009 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/00, C09D177/00, C08L23/08, C09D123/08 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
C08L77/00 (EP,CN,US);
C09D177/00 (EP,CN,US);
C08F8/44 (EP,US);
C08L77/02 (EP,CN,US);
C08L77/06 (EP,CN,US);
C09D177/02 (EP,CN,US);
C09D177/06 (EP,CN,US);
C09D5/03 (CN);
F16L58/1054 (EP,CN,US);
C08L2205/025 (CN);
C08L2205/03 (CN);
C08L23/0876 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L77/00, C08L23/0876 (US,CN,EP);
C08L77/02, C08L23/0876 (US,CN,EP);
C08L77/06, C08L23/0876 (US,CN,EP);
C09D177/00, C08L23/0876 (US,CN,EP);
C09D177/02, C08L23/0876 (CN,EP,US);
C09D177/06, C08L23/0876 (CN,EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEHÄRTENDE PULVERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2014/45] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC POWDER COMPOSITIONS | [2014/45] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POUDRE THERMOPLASTIQUE | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 06.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.12.2012 | AL | 11.04.2018 | AT | 11.04.2018 | CY | 11.04.2018 | CZ | 11.04.2018 | DK | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | ES | 11.04.2018 | FI | 11.04.2018 | HR | 11.04.2018 | IT | 11.04.2018 | LT | 11.04.2018 | LV | 11.04.2018 | MC | 11.04.2018 | MK | 11.04.2018 | NL | 11.04.2018 | PL | 11.04.2018 | RO | 11.04.2018 | RS | 11.04.2018 | SE | 11.04.2018 | SI | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | SM | 11.04.2018 | TR | 11.04.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | NO | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | IS | 11.08.2018 | PT | 13.08.2018 | IE | 27.12.2018 | LU | 27.12.2018 | MT | 27.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 27.12.2012 | |
AL | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
MK | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
IE | 27.12.2018 | ||
LU | 27.12.2018 | ||
MT | 27.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 27.12.2012 | |
AL | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
IE | 27.12.2018 | ||
LU | 27.12.2018 | ||
MT | 27.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
IE | 27.12.2018 | ||
LU | 27.12.2018 | ||
MT | 27.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
IE | 27.12.2018 | ||
LU | 27.12.2018 | ||
MT | 27.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
IE | 27.12.2018 | ||
LU | 27.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
IE | 27.12.2018 | ||
LU | 27.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
IE | 27.12.2018 | ||
LU | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
LU | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
LU | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 11.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US6680082 (CHOU RICHARD TIEN-HUA [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * claims 1-8; column 2, line 19 to column 3, line 13; column 3, lines 35-63; column 4, lines 25-40; column 5, lines 5-10; column 7, line 63 to column 8, line 15; column 9, lines 34-38; column 11, lines 30-50; column 12, lines 11-19; examples *; | [A]US2010113670 (AUDENAERT MARC [FR], et al) [A] 1-15* claims 1-7; paragraphs 1-2, 6-7 and 31-39; examples * | by applicant | US3264272 | US4056653 | US4440908 | US4481239 | US5320905 | US5344883 | JPH07145271 | US6090454 | US6680082 |