EP2786275 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INFORMATION SEARCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alibaba Group Holding Limited Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 Grand Cayman / KY | [2014/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEN, Yue c/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/F Building A The West Lake International Plaza of S&T. No. 391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou 310013 / CN | 02 /
JIN, Kaimin c/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/F Building A The West Lake International Plaza of S&T. No. 391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou 310013 / CN | [2014/41] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Wilson, Alan Stuart Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12808973.7 | 30.11.2012 | WO2012US67411 | Priority number, date | CN201110391864 | 30.11.2011 Original published format: CN201110391864 | [2014/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013082506 | Date: | 06.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2786275 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
G06F16/3338 (EP,US);
G06F40/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INFORMATIONSSUCHE | [2014/41] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INFORMATION SEARCHING | [2014/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RECHERCHE D'INFORMATIONS | [2014/41] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 30.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005080775 (COLLEDGE MATTHEW [CA], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0083] *; | [X]US2007203929 (BOLIVAR ALVARO [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0068] * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP1930816 (FAST SEARCH & TRANSFER ASA [NO]) [A] 1-20* paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0085] *; | [XI]US2010094835 (LU YUMAO [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0054] * [I] 2-20 |