EP2786448 - HEAT SHRINKABLE TUBE MOUNT METHOD AND HEAT SHRINKABLE TUBE MOUNTING JIG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yazaki Corporation 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8333 / JP | [2014/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITO, Takahiro c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 2464-48 Washizu Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0431 / JP | [2014/41] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12809867.0 | 29.11.2012 | WO2012JP81578 | Priority number, date | JP20110260810 | 29.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011260810 | [2014/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013081175 | Date: | 06.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2786448 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/72, H01R43/00 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
H01R43/005 (EP,US);
H01R13/5216 (EP,US);
H01R4/72 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINES SCHRUMPFSCHLAUCHES UND MONTAGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHRUMPFSCHLAUCH | [2014/41] | English: | HEAT SHRINKABLE TUBE MOUNT METHOD AND HEAT SHRINKABLE TUBE MOUNTING JIG | [2014/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE DE TUBE THERMORÉTRACTABLE ET GABARIT DE MONTAGE DE TUBE THERMORÉTRACTABLE | [2014/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 30.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1528628 (TYCO ELECTRONICS RAYCHEM KK [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2006261065 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1,2 * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | JP2005135858 |