EP2788039 - POLYMER CEMENTS USED FOR FIXING PROSTHESES, FOR BONE REPAIR AND FOR VERTEBROPLASTY, AND OBTAINED FROM LIQUID SINGLE-PHASE FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polymerexpert SA 1 allée du Doyen Georges Brus 33600 Pessac / FR | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOLATKHANI, Marc 33 chemin de Pichelèbre F-33610 Cestas / FR | 02 /
HUPIN, Christophe 20 le Grand Chemin F-33770 Salles / FR | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2014/42] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12810380.1 | 07.12.2012 | [2017/28] | WO2012FR52847 | Priority number, date | FR20110061395 | 09.12.2011 Original published format: FR 1161395 | [2014/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013083935 | Date: | 13.06.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2788039 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2788039 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61L24/06, A61L27/16 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
A61L24/06 (EP,US);
A61B17/8805 (US);
A61B17/8833 (US);
A61L27/16 (EP,US);
C08L33/12 (US);
C08L53/00 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61L24/06, C08L33/10 (US,EP);
A61L27/16, C08L33/10 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUS EINPHASIGEN FLÜSSIGEN FORMULIERUNGEN GEWONNENE POLYMERZEMENTE ZUR FIXIERUNG VON PROTHESEN, ZUR KNOCHENREPARATUR UND FÜR DIE VERTEBROPLASTIE | [2014/42] | English: | POLYMER CEMENTS USED FOR FIXING PROSTHESES, FOR BONE REPAIR AND FOR VERTEBROPLASTY, AND OBTAINED FROM LIQUID SINGLE-PHASE FORMULATIONS | [2014/42] | French: | CIMENTS POLYMERES POUR LA FIXATION DE PROTHESES, LA REPARATION OSSEUSE ET LA VERTEBROPLASTIE OBTENUS A PARTIR DE FORMULATIONS MONOPHASIQUES LIQUIDES. | [2014/42] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 12.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2012 | AL | 12.07.2017 | AT | 12.07.2017 | CY | 12.07.2017 | CZ | 12.07.2017 | DK | 12.07.2017 | EE | 12.07.2017 | FI | 12.07.2017 | HR | 12.07.2017 | LT | 12.07.2017 | LV | 12.07.2017 | MC | 12.07.2017 | MK | 12.07.2017 | MT | 12.07.2017 | NL | 12.07.2017 | PL | 12.07.2017 | PT | 12.07.2017 | RO | 12.07.2017 | RS | 12.07.2017 | SE | 12.07.2017 | SI | 12.07.2017 | SK | 12.07.2017 | SM | 12.07.2017 | TR | 12.07.2017 | BG | 12.10.2017 | NO | 12.10.2017 | GR | 13.10.2017 | IS | 12.11.2017 | IE | 07.12.2017 | LU | 07.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
AT | 12.07.2017 | ||
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MK | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
AT | 12.07.2017 | ||
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MK | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
AT | 12.07.2017 | ||
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MK | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
AT | 12.07.2017 | ||
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
AT | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 07.12.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
SM | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.07.2017 | |
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RS | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 12.07.2017 | |
NO | 12.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2007027230 (BEYAR MORDECHAY [IL], et al) [X] 15-18 * page 2, paragraph 19 - paragraph 24 * * page 3, paragraph 25 - paragraph 32 * * page 4, paragraph 40 - paragraph 53 * [I] 1-14; | [X]WO2010005442 (UNIV SYRACUSE [US], et al) [X] 15,16 * page 2, paragraph 6 - page 3, paragraph 10 ** page 4, paragraph 12 *; | [X]US2010228358 (LEONARD ALAIN [FR], et al) [X] 15,16 * page 1, paragraph 6 - paragraph 8 * * page 3, paragraph 26 * * page 4, paragraph 49 - paragraph 53 * * page 5, paragraph 60 - paragraph 61 *; | [X]WO2010115138 (LIGHT CURE LLC [US], et al) [X] 15-18 * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 5 * * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 10 * * page 8, paragraph 24 - paragraph 31 * * page 14, line 24 - page 15, line 2 * * page 17, line 9 - line 25 *; | [X]WO2011004355 (TORINO POLITECNICO [IT], et al) [X] 15,16 * page 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 6 * * page 6, paragraph 5 * | by applicant | EP0450000 | EP0700000 | US2007027230 | WO2010005442 | US2010228358 | WO2010115138 | WO2011004355 | - J. CHAMLEY, J.BONE JOINT SURG, (1960), vol. 42B, page 28 | - LEWIS G., J BIOMED MATER RES B: APPL. BIOMATER., (2008), vol. 84B, page 301 | - LEWIS G., J. BIOMED. MATER RES B, (2006), vol. 76B, pages 456 - 468 | - MC GRAW JK ET AL., J VASC INTERV RADIOL, (2003), vol. 14, pages S311 - 5 | - GALIBERT P ET AL., NEUROCHIRURGIE, (1987), vol. 33, page 166 | - WIXSON, R.L. ET AL., J. OF ARTHROPLASTY, (1987), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 141 - 149 | - SIVARAM, S. ET AL., POLYMER BULLETIN, (1980), vol. 3, no. 1-2, pages 27 - 35 | - AINSI GRADOS ET AL., RHEUMATOLOGY, (2000), vol. 39, pages 1410 - 4 | - CYTEVAL ET AL., AJR, (1999), vol. 173, pages 1685 - 90 |