EP2730804 - EPICYCLIC REDUCTION GEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Heavy Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6025 / JP | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIZUKA, Masayuki c/o Sumitomo Heavy Industries LTD. Yokosuka Works 19 Natsushima-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 237-8555 / JP | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [2022/02] |
Former [2014/20] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12811182.0 | 11.06.2012 | [2022/02] | WO2012JP64912 | Priority number, date | JP20110152316 | 08.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011152316 | JP20110159435 | 20.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011159435 | JP20110181864 | 23.08.2011 Original published format: JP 2011181864 | JP20110192128 | 02.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011192128 | [2014/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013008571 | Date: | 17.01.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2730804 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2730804 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60K7/00, B60K17/04, F16H1/32 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
B60K17/043 (EP);
F16H1/32 (EP,CN);
B60K7/00 (CN);
B60K7/0007 (EP);
F16H57/08 (CN);
B60K2007/0038 (EP);
B60K2007/0092 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/01] | B60K17/04, B60K7/00 | ||
Former IPC [2014/20] | F16H1/32, B60K7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EPIZYKLISCHES UNTERSETZUNGSGETRIEBE | [2014/20] | English: | EPICYCLIC REDUCTION GEAR | [2014/20] | French: | ENGRENAGE RÉDUCTEUR ÉPICYCLOÏDAL | [2014/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2014 | Translation filed | 07.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 22.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2019 | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2012 | AL | 12.01.2022 | AT | 12.01.2022 | CY | 12.01.2022 | CZ | 12.01.2022 | DK | 12.01.2022 | EE | 12.01.2022 | ES | 12.01.2022 | FI | 12.01.2022 | HR | 12.01.2022 | LT | 12.01.2022 | LV | 12.01.2022 | MC | 12.01.2022 | MK | 12.01.2022 | MT | 12.01.2022 | NL | 12.01.2022 | PL | 12.01.2022 | RO | 12.01.2022 | RS | 12.01.2022 | SE | 12.01.2022 | SI | 12.01.2022 | SK | 12.01.2022 | SM | 12.01.2022 | BG | 12.04.2022 | NO | 12.04.2022 | GR | 13.04.2022 | IS | 12.05.2022 | PT | 12.05.2022 | GB | 11.06.2022 | IE | 11.06.2022 | LU | 11.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | FR | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 11.06.2012 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
MK | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
GB | 11.06.2022 | ||
IE | 11.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 11.06.2012 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
GB | 11.06.2022 | ||
IE | 11.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 11.06.2012 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
GB | 11.06.2022 | ||
IE | 11.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
GB | 11.06.2022 | ||
IE | 11.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 11.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 11.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 11.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 11.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 12.01.2022 | |
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 12.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9202745 (UNIPAT AG [CH]) [A] 1-6* figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5533943 (ICHIOKA EIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,4 * | International search | [A]JP2008215550 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JPH06249298 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [A]JPH1122789 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [A]JPS6245449U (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD.) | Examination | US2004061393 | DE10243809 | by applicant | JP2005076716 |