EP2786363 - A SECURITY SEALING SYSTEM INCORPORATING THE SEALING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELC PRODUTOS DE SEGURANCA INDUSTRIA E COMERCIO LTDA Estrada Prefeito Antonio da Cruz Barros 693 - Limoeiro CEP-25850-000 Paraiba do Sul-RJ / BR | [2016/08] |
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states ELC PRODUTOS DE SEGURANCA INDUSTRIA E COMERCIO LTDA Estrada Prefeito Antonio da Cruz Barros 663 - Limoeiro CEP-25850-000 Paraiba do Sul-RJ / BR | ||
Former [2014/41] | For all designated states ELC PRODUTOS DE SEGURANCA INDUSTRIA E COMERCIO LTDA Estrada Prefeito Antonio da Cruz Barros 693 - Limoeiro 25850-000 Paraiba do Sul-RJ / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LIMA CASTRO, André Rua Othon Bezerra de Melo 40 CEP-22460-310 Rio de Janeiro - RJ / BR | [2014/41] | Representative(s) | Burt, Matthew Thomas, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [2014/41] | Application number, filing date | 12812145.6 | 29.11.2012 | [2016/05] | WO2012BR00481 | Priority number, date | BR2011PI07001 | 29.11.2011 Original published format: BR PI1107001 | [2014/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013078522 | Date: | 06.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2786363 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2786363 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/03 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
G09F3/0323 (EP,US);
E05B83/14 (US);
G09F3/037 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1498 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSSYSTEM MIT EINEM DICHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2014/41] | English: | A SECURITY SEALING SYSTEM INCORPORATING THE SEALING SYSTEM | [2014/41] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INVIOLABILITÉ COMPRENANT LE SYSTÈME DE FERMETURE | [2014/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 01.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.01.2016 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2012 | AL | 03.02.2016 | AT | 03.02.2016 | BE | 03.02.2016 | CY | 03.02.2016 | CZ | 03.02.2016 | DK | 03.02.2016 | EE | 03.02.2016 | FI | 03.02.2016 | HR | 03.02.2016 | LT | 03.02.2016 | LV | 03.02.2016 | MC | 03.02.2016 | MK | 03.02.2016 | NL | 03.02.2016 | PL | 03.02.2016 | RO | 03.02.2016 | RS | 03.02.2016 | SE | 03.02.2016 | SI | 03.02.2016 | SK | 03.02.2016 | SM | 03.02.2016 | TR | 03.02.2016 | BG | 03.05.2016 | NO | 03.05.2016 | GR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 03.06.2016 | PT | 03.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 29.11.2012 | |
AT | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CY | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
TR | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 29.11.2012 | |
AT | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CY | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
MK | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
BE | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
SM | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RS | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 03.02.2016 | |
HR | 03.02.2016 | ||
NO | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9319995 (ELC PROD SEGURANCA IND [BR], et al) [AD] 1-4 * page 5, line 22 - page 7, line 21 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2011086453 (PLASTI MAX SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 23 ** figure 1 * |