EP2793708 - DEVICES FOR OCCLUDING OR PROMOTING FLUID FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/44] | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR OCCLUDING OR PROMOTING FLUID FLOW | ||
[2017/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coleman, James E. 20 Greenmount Road Terenure Dublin 6 / IE | For all designated states Cummins, Christy 9 Furnes Manor Johnstown Naas County Kildare / IE | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/46] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2014/44] | Keane, Paul Fachtna Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 12812596.0 | 18.12.2012 | [2017/46] | WO2012EP76029 | Priority number, date | US201113333242 | 21.12.2011 Original published format: US201113333242 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013092636 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2793708 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2793708 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/04, A61B17/11, A61B17/12, A61F6/22, A61B17/24, A61B18/14, // A61B17/22, A61B17/42, A61B18/00 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/0401 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/11 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/12022 (US);
A61B17/1204 (US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/2442 (US);
A61F2/2487 (US);
A61F6/22 (EP,US);
A61B17/0487 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/24 (US);
A61B2017/00243 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00575 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00579 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00592 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00606 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00619 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00623 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00986 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/0409 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/0412 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/0414 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/042 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/0422 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/0424 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/0464 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/0496 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/1107 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/1135 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/12004 (US);
A61B2017/22044 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/22047 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/4233 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2018/00279 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2018/00351 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2018/00357 (EP,CN,US);
F04C2270/041 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/44] | A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR SPERRUNG ODER FÖRDERUNG EINES FLÜSSIGKEITSFLUSSES | [2017/33] | English: | DEVICES FOR OCCLUDING OR PROMOTING FLUID FLOW | [2017/33] | French: | DISPOSITIFS POUR ARRÊTER OU FAVORISER UN ÉCOULEMENT DE FLUIDE | [2017/33] |
Former [2014/44] | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR SPERRUNG ODER FÖRDERUNG EINES FLÜSSIGKEITSFLUSSES | ||
Former [2014/44] | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR OCCLUDING OR PROMOTING FLUID FLOW | ||
Former [2014/44] | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR ARRÊTER OU FAVORISER UN ÉCOULEMENT DE FLUIDE | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 14.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2012 | AL | 15.11.2017 | AT | 15.11.2017 | CY | 15.11.2017 | CZ | 15.11.2017 | EE | 15.11.2017 | HR | 15.11.2017 | LT | 15.11.2017 | LV | 15.11.2017 | MC | 15.11.2017 | MK | 15.11.2017 | NL | 15.11.2017 | PT | 15.11.2017 | RO | 15.11.2017 | RS | 15.11.2017 | SI | 15.11.2017 | SK | 15.11.2017 | SM | 15.11.2017 | TR | 15.11.2017 | LU | 18.12.2017 | MT | 18.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | FR | 15.01.2018 | BG | 15.02.2018 | NO | 15.02.2018 | GR | 16.02.2018 | IS | 15.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 18.12.2012 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MK | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.12.2017 | ||
MT | 18.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 15.01.2018 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 18.12.2012 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MK | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.12.2017 | ||
MT | 18.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 15.01.2018 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 18.12.2012 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MK | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.12.2017 | ||
MT | 18.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 15.01.2018 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.12.2012 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.12.2017 | ||
MT | 18.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 15.01.2018 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.12.2017 | ||
MT | 18.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 15.01.2018 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.12.2017 | ||
MT | 18.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 15.01.2018 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.12.2017 | ||
MT | 18.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 15.01.2018 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.12.2017 | ||
MT | 18.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | LT | 15.11.2017 | |
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5853422 (HUEBSCH JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,10,11,13 * column 4, lines 20-37 * * column 5, lines 22-62 * * figures 2-4,6-13 * [I] 2; | [XI]US2008147101 (ORTIZ MARK S [US], et al) [X] 1,4,10,11,13 * paragraphs [0020] - [0023] - [0027] - [0030]; figures 1,3,4,9-11,14 * [I] 5-7; | [A]US2010114128 (COLEMAN JAMES E [IE], et al) [A] 1,14,15* the whole document * |