EP2795638 - COOLING RADIATOR HAVING LIQUID COOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmehmann Rohrverformungstechnik GmbH Unter den Eichen 16 56470 Bad Marienberg / DE | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROß, Otto, Karl Gartenstraße 29 56470 Bad Marienber / DE | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger Gihske Grosse Klüppel Kross Bürogemeinschaft von Patentanwälten Hammerstrasse 3 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger Gihske, Grosse, Klüppel, Kross Bürogemeinschaft Hammerstrasse 3 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12812867.5 | 21.12.2012 | [2016/12] | WO2012EP05336 | Priority number, date | DE201110122317 | 23.12.2011 Original published format: DE102011122317 | [2014/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013091890 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2795638 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2795638 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/08 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
H01F27/10 (EP,US);
F28D1/00 (US);
H01F27/085 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLRADIATOR MIT FLÜSSIGKEITSKÜHLUNG | [2014/44] | English: | COOLING RADIATOR HAVING LIQUID COOLING | [2014/44] | French: | RADIATEUR DE REFROIDISSEMENT À REFROIDISSEMENT PAR LIQUIDE | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 16.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | MT | 23.03.2016 | SM | 23.03.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | NO | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | LU | 21.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | CY | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
MT | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CY | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | CY | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | DK | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | DK | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | DK | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0500390 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,16,17 * column 1, lines 1 - 6 * * column 2, lines 10 - 35 * * column 11, lines 40 - 50 * * column 13, line 31 - column 14, line 7 * * column 24, lines 6-11 * * column 28, line 26 - column 29, line 3 * * figures 8, 10, 37, 38, 40 * [I] 3,6,7,11-15; | [XI]WO9423257 (MELANESIA INT TRUST [VU], et al) [X] 1-5,8,11,16,17 * page 1, lines 4 - 10 * * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 16 * * page 8, line 19 - page 9, line 1 * * page 12, lines 12 - 21 * * figures 1-4, 7, 9, 10 * [I] 6,7,9,10,12-15; | [XI]WO0163629 (UNIFIN INTERNATIONAL INC [CA]) [X] 1-3,16,17 * page 1, lines 3 - 5 * * page 2, lines 19 - 31 * * page 4, lines 24 - 26 * * page 7, line 5 - page 8, line 1 * * figures 1 - 4 * [I] 6-15; | [X]KR100773027B (KWON OH KYUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1* figures 1 - 4 * |