EP2798133 - PANEL FOR A SYSTEM CEILING FORMWORK, AND A SYSTEM CEILING FORMWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friedr. Ischebeck GmbH Loher Strasse 31-79 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COERSCHULTE, Ferdinand Gartenstraße 20 59846 Sundern / DE | 02 /
ISCHEBECK, Björn Schützenstraße 14 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 12813333.7 | 19.12.2012 | [2016/12] | WO2012EP76180 | Priority number, date | DE20111057121 | 29.12.2011 Original published format: DE102011057121 | [2014/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013098159 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2798133 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2798133 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04G11/38 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
E04G11/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PANEEL FÜR EINE SYSTEM-DECKENSCHALUNG UND SYSTEM-DECKENSCHALUNG | [2014/45] | English: | PANEL FOR A SYSTEM CEILING FORMWORK, AND A SYSTEM CEILING FORMWORK | [2014/45] | French: | PANNEAU POUR UN SYSTÈME DE COFFRAGE DE PLAFOND ET SYSTÈME DE COFFRAGE DE PLAFOND | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 22.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2012 | AL | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | HR | 23.03.2016 | IT | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | MT | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | RS | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | SM | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | NO | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | IE | 19.12.2016 | LU | 19.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 19.12.2012 | |
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
MT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
IE | 19.12.2016 | ||
LU | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 19.12.2012 | |
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
MT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
IE | 19.12.2016 | ||
LU | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.12.2012 | |
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
IE | 19.12.2016 | ||
LU | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
IE | 19.12.2016 | ||
LU | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2011057977 (ISCHEBECK FRIEDRICH GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * figure - * [I] 4,7,9-22; | [A]WO2010108997 (FARESIN BUILDING DIVISION S P [IT], et al) [A] 1-22 * figure - *; | [A]US6378837 (KELLER MELVIN [US]) [A] 1-22 * figure - *; | [A]EP1617013 (CEDEMAT ALUGUER DE MATERIAIS D [PT]) [A] 1-22 * figure - *; | [A]DE102004004883 (ISCHEBECK FRIEDRICH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-22 * figure - *; | [A]US3045786 (LA RAMBELJE HENRY A DE) [A] 1-22 * figure - *; | [A]EP0511921 (RICARD COFFRAGES [FR]) [A] 1-22 * figure - * | by applicant | DE102004004883 |